Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Weights and Measures

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0179
Title
Vehicle Laws - Chesapeake Bay Commemorative Registration Plates - Truck Eligibility
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0459 /CH0316 (SB0389)
Title
Birth and Death Certificates - Fee Reduction
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0486
Title
Motor Vehicles - Gross Vehicle Weight - Agricultural Products
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0698 (SB0573)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Gross Weight and Axle Load - Poultry
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0791 /CH0120 (SB0746)
Title
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Tasting License
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0821
Title
Energy Storage Portfolio Standard (Storage Technology and Electric Power (STEP) Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0843 /CH0127 (SB0695)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon License
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0925 (SB0959)
Title
Kent County - Alcoholic Beverages - Limited Distillery License
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1013 /CH0036 (SB0908)
Title
Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1071 /CH0455 (SB0958/CH0454)
Title
Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses
Sponsor
Cecil County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1106 /CH0001 (SB0921/CH0002)
Title
Clean Energy Jobs - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Frick
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1117
Title
Environment - Mattress Stewardship Program
Sponsor
Delegate Hill
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1337 /CH0310
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Liquor - Manufacturer's and Wholesaler's Licenses and Permits
Sponsor
Delegate Barkley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1496
Title
Farmers' Rights Act
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1627
Title
Vehicle Laws - Class G (Trailer) Vehicles - Permanent Registration
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0389 (HB0459/CH0316)
Title
Birth and Death Certificates - Fee Reduction
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0573 (HB0698)
Title
Task Force to Study the Impact of Hauling Grain, Poultry, and Dairy on State Highways
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0630 /CH0418
Title
Comptroller - Distillery Off-Site Permit and Liquor Festival Permit
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0695 (HB0843/CH0127)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon License
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0746 (HB0791/CH0120)
Title
Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Tasting License
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0761
Title
Farmers' Rights Act
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0958 /CH0454 (HB1071/CH0455)
Title
Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses
Sponsor
Cecil County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0959 (HB0925)
Title
Kent County - Alcoholic Beverages - Limited Distillery License
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1127
Title
Business Regulation - Retail Service Station Dealers - Required Signs
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0179 Vehicle Laws - Chesapeake Bay Commemorative Registration Plates - Truck Eligibility Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0459 /CH0316 (SB0389) Birth and Death Certificates - Fee Reduction Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316
Ways and Means
3/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0486 Motor Vehicles - Gross Vehicle Weight - Agricultural Products Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0698 (SB0573) Motor Vehicles - Gross Weight and Axle Load - Poultry Delegate Otto 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0791 /CH0120 (SB0746) Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Tasting License Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 120
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0821 Energy Storage Portfolio Standard (Storage Technology and Electric Power (STEP) Act) Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters; Withdrawn
Economic Matters
2/25/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0843 /CH0127 (SB0695) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon License Frederick County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 127
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0925 (SB0959) Kent County - Alcoholic Beverages - Limited Distillery License Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1013 /CH0036 (SB0908) Maryland Open Transportation Investment Decision Act of 2016 Delegate Beidle 2 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 36
Appropriations
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1071 /CH0455 (SB0958/CH0454) Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses Cecil County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 455
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1106 /CH0001 (SB0921/CH0002) Clean Energy Jobs - Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard Revisions Delegate Frick 2 2 Became law per Maryland Constitution, Chapter 1 of 2017
Economic Matters
3/03/2016 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1117 Environment - Mattress Stewardship Program Delegate Hill 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1337 /CH0310 Alcoholic Beverages - Liquor - Manufacturer's and Wholesaler's Licenses and Permits Delegate Barkley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 310
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1496 Farmers' Rights Act Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1627 Vehicle Laws - Class G (Trailer) Vehicles - Permanent Registration Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0389 (HB0459/CH0316) Birth and Death Certificates - Fee Reduction President 3 2 In the House - Hearing 4/09 at 9:30 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/09/2016 - 9:30 AM
Appropriations
SB0573 (HB0698) Task Force to Study the Impact of Hauling Grain, Poultry, and Dairy on State Highways Senator Mathias 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0630 /CH0418 Comptroller - Distillery Off-Site Permit and Liquor Festival Permit Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 418
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0695 (HB0843/CH0127) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beauty Salon License Senator Young 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0746 (HB0791/CH0120) Carroll County - Alcoholic Beverages - Beer, Wine, and Liquor Tasting License Senator Ready 2 2 Veto sustained (0-46)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0761 Farmers' Rights Act Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0958 /CH0454 (HB1071/CH0455) Cecil County - Alcoholic Beverages - Licenses Cecil County Senators 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 454
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0959 (HB0925) Kent County - Alcoholic Beverages - Limited Distillery License Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1127 Business Regulation - Retail Service Station Dealers - Required Signs Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:52 PM