Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Welfare -see also- Social Services

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0439 (SB0685/CH0046)
Title
Family Law - Information and Services for Foster Children and Former Foster Children
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0460 /CH0422
Title
Couples Advancing Together Pilot Program - Eligibility and Extension
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0553 (SB0585)
Title
Maryland No-Fault Injured Baby Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0641 (SB0487)
Title
Family Child Care - Registration Requirements for Participants in Maryland Child Care Subsidy Program
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0643 (SB0567/CH0366)
Title
Department of Human Resources - State Child Welfare System - Report
Sponsor
Delegate Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1059 (SB0686)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction Act
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0487 (HB0641)
Title
Child Care - Providers and Maryland Child Care Subsidy Program
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0567 /CH0366 (HB0643)
Title
Department of Human Resources - State Child Welfare System - Report
Sponsor
Senator Gladden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0585 (HB0553)
Title
Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund
Sponsor
Senator Pugh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0685 /CH0046 (HB0439)
Title
Family Law - Information and Services for Foster Children and Former Foster Children
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0686 (HB1059)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction Act
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0439 (SB0685/CH0046) Family Law - Information and Services for Foster Children and Former Foster Children Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Judiciary
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0460 /CH0422 Couples Advancing Together Pilot Program - Eligibility and Extension Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 422
Appropriations
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0553 (SB0585) Maryland No-Fault Injured Baby Fund Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
3/16/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB0641 (SB0487) Family Child Care - Registration Requirements for Participants in Maryland Child Care Subsidy Program Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0643 (SB0567/CH0366) Department of Human Resources - State Child Welfare System - Report Delegate Zucker 2 2 Veto sustained (0-141)
Appropriations
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1059 (SB0686) Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction Act Delegate Barnes, D. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0487 (HB0641) Child Care - Providers and Maryland Child Care Subsidy Program Senator King 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0567 /CH0366 (HB0643) Department of Human Resources - State Child Welfare System - Report Senator Gladden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 366
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/08/2015 - 2:00 PM
SB0585 (HB0553) Maryland No-Fault Birth Injury Fund Senator Pugh 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2015 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0685 /CH0046 (HB0439) Family Law - Information and Services for Foster Children and Former Foster Children Senator Benson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 46
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0686 (HB1059) Criminal Procedure - Maryland Uniform Collateral Consequences of Conviction Act Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM