Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Welfare -see also- Social Services

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0146 /CH0110
Title
Secretary of Aging - Administration of Commodity Supplemental Food Program and Regulatory Authority
Sponsor
Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0172 (SB0728)
Title
Home Act of 2017
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0752 /CH0203 (SB0671/CH0202)
Title
Department of Human Resources - Public Assistance Eligibility - Financial Records
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0860 /CH0793 (SB0853/CH0792)
Title
Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Repeal of Restrictions (Maryland Equal Access to Food Act of 2017)
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0991 (SB0382/CH0280)
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Participation by Satellite Organizations
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1002 /CH0777 (SB0966)
Title
Electric Universal Service Program - Unexpended Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Davis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1469 /CH0737 (SB1009/CH0738)
Title
Public Assistance - Family Investment Program - Child Support Pass Through
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0382 /CH0280 (HB0991)
Title
State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Participation by Satellite Organizations
Sponsor
Senator McFadden
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0671 /CH0202 (HB0752/CH0203)
Title
Department of Human Resources - Public Assistance Eligibility - Financial Records
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0853 /CH0792 (HB0860/CH0793)
Title
Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Repeal of Restrictions (Maryland Equal Access to Food Act of 2017)
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0966 (HB1002/CH0777)
Title
Electric Universal Service Program - Unexpended Funds
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1009 /CH0738 (HB1469/CH0737)
Title
Public Assistance - Family Investment Program - Child Support Pass Through
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1092
Title
Public Assistance Fraud Prevention Act
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0146 /CH0110 Secretary of Aging - Administration of Commodity Supplemental Food Program and Regulatory Authority Chair, Health and Government Operations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 110
Health and Government Operations
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0172 (SB0728) Home Act of 2017 Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0752 /CH0203 (SB0671/CH0202) Department of Human Resources - Public Assistance Eligibility - Financial Records Delegate Kelly 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 203
Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0860 /CH0793 (SB0853/CH0792) Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Repeal of Restrictions (Maryland Equal Access to Food Act of 2017) Delegate Lierman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 793
Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0991 (SB0382/CH0280) State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Participation by Satellite Organizations Delegate Lierman 2 2 Veto sustained (0-140)
Appropriations
3/02/2017 - 3:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1002 /CH0777 (SB0966) Electric Universal Service Program - Unexpended Funds Delegate Davis 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 777
Economic Matters
2/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
4/06/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1469 /CH0737 (SB1009/CH0738) Public Assistance - Family Investment Program - Child Support Pass Through Delegate Young, P. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 737
Appropriations
3/02/2017 - 3:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0382 /CH0280 (HB0991) State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program - Participation by Satellite Organizations Senator McFadden 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 280
Finance
2/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/02/2017 - 3:00 PM
SB0671 /CH0202 (HB0752/CH0203) Department of Human Resources - Public Assistance Eligibility - Financial Records Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 202
Finance
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0853 /CH0792 (HB0860/CH0793) Transitional Supports for Ex-Offenders - Repeal of Restrictions (Maryland Equal Access to Food Act of 2017) Senator Madaleno 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 792
Finance
3/09/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
4/05/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0966 (HB1002/CH0777) Electric Universal Service Program - Unexpended Funds Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Veto sustained (0-44)
Finance
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1009 /CH0738 (HB1469/CH0737) Public Assistance - Family Investment Program - Child Support Pass Through Senator Jennings 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 738
Finance
3/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1092 Public Assistance Fraud Prevention Act Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:54 PM