Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Welfare -see also- Social Services

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0214
Title
Prince George's County - Equality in Education Act PG 505-18
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0580 (SB0250)
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Prohibited Lease Provisions - Late Fees for Tenants Receiving Government Benefits
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0933
Title
Housing and Community Development - Rental Allowance Program - Eligibility
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0941 /CH0396
Title
Child Care Subsidy Program – Unemployment – Eligibility
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1235 (SB0818/CH0562)
Title
Education - Maryland Meals for Achievement In-Classroom Breakfast Program - Eligibility and Annual Appropriation
Sponsor
Delegate McIntosh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1468 /CH0793
Title
Transit - Job Access and Reverse Commute (JARC) Program
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1615 /CH0408 (SB1231)
Title
Human Services - Temporary Disability Assistance Program
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1729 (SB1164)
Title
Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1765 /CH0585
Title
On–Site Sewage Disposal Systems – Watershed Implementation Plan and Bay Restoration Fund Disbursements and Financial Assistance
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0818 /CH0562 (HB1235)
Title
Education - Maryland Meals for Achievement In-Classroom Breakfast Program - Eligibility and Annual Appropriation
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1001 /CH0596
Title
Employee Benefits – State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program and Maryland Small Business Retirement Savings Program
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1034
Title
Human Services – State Public Assistance Eligibility – Arrest Warrant
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1164 (HB1729)
Title
Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0214 Prince George's County - Equality in Education Act PG 505-18 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0580 (SB0250) Landlord and Tenant - Prohibited Lease Provisions - Late Fees for Tenants Receiving Government Benefits Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0933 Housing and Community Development - Rental Allowance Program - Eligibility Delegate Barnes, B. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB0941 /CH0396 Child Care Subsidy Program – Unemployment – Eligibility Delegate Queen 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 396
Appropriations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1235 (SB0818/CH0562) Education - Maryland Meals for Achievement In-Classroom Breakfast Program - Eligibility and Annual Appropriation Delegate McIntosh 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1468 /CH0793 Transit - Job Access and Reverse Commute (JARC) Program Delegate Beidle 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 793
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2018 - 2:30 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1615 /CH0408 (SB1231) Human Services - Temporary Disability Assistance Program Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 408
Appropriations
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1729 (SB1164) Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Funding Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1765 /CH0585 On–Site Sewage Disposal Systems – Watershed Implementation Plan and Bay Restoration Fund Disbursements and Financial Assistance Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 585
Environment and Transportation
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/03/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0818 /CH0562 (HB1235) Education - Maryland Meals for Achievement In-Classroom Breakfast Program - Eligibility and Annual Appropriation Senator Madaleno 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 562
Budget and Taxation
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB1001 /CH0596 Employee Benefits – State Employee and Retiree Health and Welfare Benefits Program and Maryland Small Business Retirement Savings Program Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 596
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2018 - 2:00 PM
Finance
Economic Matters
3/28/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1034 Human Services – State Public Assistance Eligibility – Arrest Warrant Senator Hough 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1164 (HB1729) Family Investment Program - Temporary Cash Assistance - Funding Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2018 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:59 PM