Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Welfare -see also- Social Services

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0105
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development – Community Development Administration – Compliance Monitoring Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0607
Title
Judges' Retirement System - Retiree Health Benefits - Mandatory Retirement
Sponsor
Health and Government Operations Committee
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0854
Title
Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center - Inclusion of Child Welfare Data and Governing Board
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1003 (SB0780)
Title
States of Emergency - Emergency Procurement and Budget Amendments - Notice and Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1076
Title
Public Assistance Programs – Data Sharing and Review (Welfare Program Integrity Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1091 (SB0829)
Title
State Procurement - Emergency and Expedited Procurements - Revisions and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1092
Title
State Procurement – Emergency and Expedited Procurements – Revisions and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1335
Title
State Prescription Drug Benefits - Retirees
Sponsor
Delegate Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0780 (HB1003)
Title
States of Emergency – Emergency Procurement and Budget Amendments – Notice and Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0829 (HB1091)
Title
State Procurement - Emergency and Expedited Procurements - Revisions and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0881
Title
Income Tax - Work Opportunity Tax Credit
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0105 Department of Housing and Community Development – Community Development Administration – Compliance Monitoring Reporting Delegate Henson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0607 Judges' Retirement System - Retiree Health Benefits - Mandatory Retirement Health and Government Operations Committee 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Health and Government Operations
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
Rules
HB0854 Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center - Inclusion of Child Welfare Data and Governing Board Delegate Kaiser 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Ways and Means
2/12/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1003 (SB0780) States of Emergency - Emergency Procurement and Budget Amendments - Notice and Authorization Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Appropriations
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1076 Public Assistance Programs – Data Sharing and Review (Welfare Program Integrity Act of 2021) Delegate Saab 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/12/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1091 (SB0829) State Procurement - Emergency and Expedited Procurements - Revisions and Reporting Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Appropriations
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1092 State Procurement – Emergency and Expedited Procurements – Revisions and Reporting Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m. (Appropriations)
Appropriations
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB1335 State Prescription Drug Benefits - Retirees Delegate Jackson 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations; Withdrawn
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0780 (HB1003) States of Emergency – Emergency Procurement and Budget Amendments – Notice and Authorization Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (127-9)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Appropriations
Health and Government Operations
SB0829 (HB1091) State Procurement - Emergency and Expedited Procurements - Revisions and Reporting Senator Lam 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0881 Income Tax - Work Opportunity Tax Credit Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/10/2021 7:53 PM
Click to return on the top page