Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Wells

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0337 (SB0514)
Title
Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0341 (SB0513)
Title
Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing Wastewater - Prohibited Acts
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0519 (SB0112)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Eagle Harbor Artesian Well Restoration
Sponsor
Delegate Proctor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1126
Title
Environment - Well Drilling - Notification to Municipalities
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1274
Title
Maryland Hydraulic Fracturing Moratorium and Right to Know Act of 2013
Sponsor
Delegate Mizeur
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0112 (HB0519)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Eagle Harbor Artesian Well Restoration
Sponsor
Senator Miller
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0513 (HB0341)
Title
Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing Wastewater - Prohibited Acts
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0514 (HB0337)
Title
Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0601
Title
Maryland Hydraulic Fracturing Moratorium and Right to Know Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0854 /CH0568
Title
Environment - Gas and Oil Drilling - Financial Assurance
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0879
Title
Natural Gas Severance Tax and Impact Account
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0337 (SB0514) Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - Prohibition Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB0341 (SB0513) Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing Wastewater - Prohibited Acts Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0519 (SB0112) Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Eagle Harbor Artesian Well Restoration Delegate Proctor 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 9:00 AM
HB1126 Environment - Well Drilling - Notification to Municipalities Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1274 Maryland Hydraulic Fracturing Moratorium and Right to Know Act of 2013 Delegate Mizeur 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0112 (HB0519) Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Eagle Harbor Artesian Well Restoration Senator Miller 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 11:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2013 - 11:00 AM
SB0513 (HB0341) Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing Wastewater - Prohibited Acts Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0514 (HB0337) Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - Prohibition Senator Montgomery 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0601 Maryland Hydraulic Fracturing Moratorium and Right to Know Act of 2013 Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0854 /CH0568 Environment - Gas and Oil Drilling - Financial Assurance Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 568
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0879 Natural Gas Severance Tax and Impact Account Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM