Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Wells

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0292
Title
Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0409
Title
Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing Wastewater - Prohibited Acts
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0865
Title
Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - Rural Residential Drinking Water Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Mizeur
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1030
Title
Public Health - Hydraulic Fracturing Chemicals - Information and Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1122 (SB0745)
Title
Shale Gas Drilling Safety Review Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Mizeur
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0360
Title
Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0535
Title
Natural Gas Severance Tax and Impact Account
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0745 (HB1122)
Title
Shale Gas Drilling Safety Review Act of 2014
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0292 Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - Prohibition Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0409 Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing Wastewater - Prohibited Acts Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0865 Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - Rural Residential Drinking Water Protection Act Delegate Mizeur 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1030 Public Health - Hydraulic Fracturing Chemicals - Information and Fund Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1122 (SB0745) Shale Gas Drilling Safety Review Act of 2014 Delegate Mizeur 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0360 Natural Gas - Hydraulic Fracturing - Prohibition Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0535 Natural Gas Severance Tax and Impact Account Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0745 (HB1122) Shale Gas Drilling Safety Review Act of 2014 Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:46 PM