Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Wells

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0449 /CH0481 (SB0409/CH0480)
Title
Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing - Regulations
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0458
Title
Environment - Exploration and Production Waste and Waste From Hydraulic Fracturing
Sponsor
Delegate Robinson, S.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0883 (SB0438)
Title
Environment - Well Drilling - Notice to Municipalities
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0952
Title
Public Health - Hydraulic Fracturing Chemicals - Information and Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0029
Title
Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing - Prohibitions
Sponsor
Senator Brochin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0409 /CH0480 (HB0449/CH0481)
Title
Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing - Regulations
Sponsor
Senator Montgomery
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0438 (HB0883)
Title
Environment - Well Drilling - Notice to Municipalities
Sponsor
Senator Middleton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0458
Title
Civil Actions - Hydraulic Fracturing Liability Act
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0712
Title
Natural Gas Severance Tax and Impact Account
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0449 /CH0481 (SB0409/CH0480) Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing - Regulations Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 481
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0458 Environment - Exploration and Production Waste and Waste From Hydraulic Fracturing Delegate Robinson, S. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0883 (SB0438) Environment - Well Drilling - Notice to Municipalities Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0952 Public Health - Hydraulic Fracturing Chemicals - Information and Fund Delegate Lam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0029 Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing - Prohibitions Senator Brochin 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0409 /CH0480 (HB0449/CH0481) Environment - Hydraulic Fracturing - Regulations Senator Montgomery 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 480
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0438 (HB0883) Environment - Well Drilling - Notice to Municipalities Senator Middleton 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0458 Civil Actions - Hydraulic Fracturing Liability Act Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2015 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/01/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0712 Natural Gas Severance Tax and Impact Account Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM