Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Wells

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0394
Title
Public Health - Hydraulic Fracturing Chemicals - Information and Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1112
Title
Environment - Gas Storage Wells and Facilities - Safety Regulations
Sponsor
Delegate Platt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1307 (SB1010)
Title
Environment - Municipal Water Supply Contamination - Remediation Costs
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0361
Title
Civil Actions - Hydraulic Fracturing Liability Act
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1010 (HB1307)
Title
Environment - Municipal Water Supply Contamination - Remediation Costs
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0394 Public Health - Hydraulic Fracturing Chemicals - Information and Fund Delegate Morhaim 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/17/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1112 Environment - Gas Storage Wells and Facilities - Safety Regulations Delegate Platt 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1307 (SB1010) Environment - Municipal Water Supply Contamination - Remediation Costs Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0361 Civil Actions - Hydraulic Fracturing Liability Act Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/31/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1010 (HB1307) Environment - Municipal Water Supply Contamination - Remediation Costs Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:52 PM