Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Wells -see also- Hydraulic Fracturing

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1456 /CH0626 (SB1128)
Title
Offshore Drilling Liability Act
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HJ0013
Title
Opposition to Proposed National Outer Continental Shelf Oil and Gas Leasing Program
Sponsor
Delegate Flanagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1029
Title
Oil and Gas Drilling and Production - Restrictions
Sponsor
Senator Madaleno
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1128 (HB1456/CH0626)
Title
Offshore Drilling Liability Act
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0011
Title
Coastal Area - Protection From Offshore Oil and Gas Drilling
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1456 /CH0626 (SB1128) Offshore Drilling Liability Act Delegate Barve 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 626
Judiciary
3/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Judicial Proceedings
HJ0013 Opposition to Proposed National Outer Continental Shelf Oil and Gas Leasing Program Delegate Flanagan 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB1029 Oil and Gas Drilling and Production - Restrictions Senator Madaleno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1128 (HB1456/CH0626) Offshore Drilling Liability Act Senator Mathias 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judicial Proceedings
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/29/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SJ0011 Coastal Area - Protection From Offshore Oil and Gas Drilling Senator Mathias 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 11:30 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/13/2018 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/30/2018 - 11:30 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:59 PM