Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Wells -see also- Hydraulic Fracturing

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0669 (SB0387)
Title
Environment - Water Quality Certifications (Pipeline and Water Protection Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Delegate Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1114 /CH0722 (SB0671/CH0723)
Title
State Board of Well Drillers - Fee Setting, Sunset Extension, and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0387 (HB0669)
Title
Environment - Water Quality Certifications (Pipeline and Water Protection Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510)
Title
State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0671 /CH0723 (HB1114/CH0722)
Title
State Board of Well Drillers - Fee Setting, Sunset Extension, and Program Evaluation
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0669 (SB0387) Environment - Water Quality Certifications (Pipeline and Water Protection Act of 2019) Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB1113 /CH0510 (SB0640/CH0511) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Delegate Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 510
Appropriations
3/01/2019 - 1:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules
HB1114 /CH0722 (SB0671/CH0723) State Board of Well Drillers - Fee Setting, Sunset Extension, and Program Evaluation Speaker 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 722
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0387 (HB0669) Environment - Water Quality Certifications (Pipeline and Water Protection Act of 2019) Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Young)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0640 /CH0511 (HB1113/CH0510) State Government - Office of Program Evaluation and Government Accountability and Maryland Program Evaluation Act Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 511
Rules
3/05/2019 - 11:30 AM
Appropriations
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0671 /CH0723 (HB1114/CH0722) State Board of Well Drillers - Fee Setting, Sunset Extension, and Program Evaluation President 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 723
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/15/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM