Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Wetlands

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0457 (SB0562)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Middle Patuxent Environmental Area Ho. Co. 1-13
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0800 (SB0524/CH0492)
Title
Wetlands and Riparian Rights - Licenses and Permits for Nonwater-Dependent Projects on State or Private Wetlands
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0994 /CH0276 (SB0462/CH0275)
Title
Environment - Wetlands and Waterways Authorizations - Installation of Personal Watercraft Lifts
Sponsor
Delegate Schuh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0462 /CH0275 (HB0994/CH0276)
Title
Environment - Wetlands and Waterways Authorizations - Installation of Personal Watercraft Lifts
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0524 /CH0492 (HB0800)
Title
Wetlands and Riparian Rights - Licenses and Permits for Nonwater-Dependent Projects on State or Private Wetlands
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0562 (HB0457)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Middle Patuxent Environmental Area
Sponsor
Howard County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0457 (SB0562) Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Middle Patuxent Environmental Area Ho. Co. 1-13 Howard County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 10:00 AM
HB0800 (SB0524/CH0492) Wetlands and Riparian Rights - Licenses and Permits for Nonwater-Dependent Projects on State or Private Wetlands Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 2:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
2/22/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB0994 /CH0276 (SB0462/CH0275) Environment - Wetlands and Waterways Authorizations - Installation of Personal Watercraft Lifts Delegate Schuh 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 276
Environmental Matters
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0462 /CH0275 (HB0994/CH0276) Environment - Wetlands and Waterways Authorizations - Installation of Personal Watercraft Lifts Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 275
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/27/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0524 /CH0492 (HB0800) Wetlands and Riparian Rights - Licenses and Permits for Nonwater-Dependent Projects on State or Private Wetlands Senator Colburn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 492
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/03/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0562 (HB0457) Creation of a State Debt - Howard County - Middle Patuxent Environmental Area Howard County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM