Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Wetlands

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0459 /CH0316 (SB0389)
Title
Birth and Death Certificates - Fee Reduction
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0797 /CH0631
Title
Nontidal Wetlands - Nontidal Wetland Mitigation Banking
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1041
Title
State Wetlands - Nonstructural Shoreline Stabilization Requirement - Waiver
Sponsor
Delegate Frush
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1341
Title
State Wetlands License - Temporary Installation of a Boat Canopy - Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate McMillan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1346 (SB0045)
Title
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of Funds
Sponsor
Delegate Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0045 (HB1346)
Title
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of Funds
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0061 /CH0043
Title
Natural Resources - Forest Lands and the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Miscellaneous Corrections and Clarifications
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0389 (HB0459/CH0316)
Title
Birth and Death Certificates - Fee Reduction
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1091
Title
Wetlands and Waterways Program - Fee Reduction
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0459 /CH0316 (SB0389) Birth and Death Certificates - Fee Reduction Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 316
Ways and Means
3/07/2016 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0797 /CH0631 Nontidal Wetlands - Nontidal Wetland Mitigation Banking Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 631
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1041 State Wetlands - Nonstructural Shoreline Stabilization Requirement - Waiver Delegate Frush 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB1341 State Wetlands License - Temporary Installation of a Boat Canopy - Exemption Delegate McMillan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1346 (SB0045) Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of Funds Delegate Simonaire 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0045 (HB1346) Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of Funds Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 2:30 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2016 - 2:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0061 /CH0043 Natural Resources - Forest Lands and the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Miscellaneous Corrections and Clarifications Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 43
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2016 - 2:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/23/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0389 (HB0459/CH0316) Birth and Death Certificates - Fee Reduction President 3 2 In the House - Hearing 4/09 at 9:30 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/09/2016 - 9:30 AM
Appropriations
SB1091 Wetlands and Waterways Program - Fee Reduction Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:52 PM