Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Wetlands

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0028 /CH0236 (SB0939/CH0237)
Title
Natural Resources - Shellfish Nursery Operations - Wetlands License Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Clark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0406 /CH0362
Title
Wetlands and Waterways Program - State-Owned Lakes - Structural Shoreline Stabilization
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0532 (SB0744)
Title
Protecting Natural Resources and Preserving Productive Farms – Commission on the Development of a Blueprint for Solar Energy in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0669 (SB0387)
Title
Environment - Water Quality Certifications (Pipeline and Water Protection Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0703 /CH0517 (SB0505/CH0518)
Title
Environmental Violations - Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0841 /CH0238
Title
Aquaculture - Submerged Aquatic Vegetation - Placement of Shellfish, Bags, Nets, and Structures
Sponsor
Delegate Clark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1309 (SB0876)
Title
Aquaculture - Leases in Water Column - Riparian Right of First Refusal
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0387 (HB0669)
Title
Environment - Water Quality Certifications (Pipeline and Water Protection Act of 2019)
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0505 /CH0518 (HB0703/CH0517)
Title
Environmental Violations - Reporting Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0744 (HB0532)
Title
Protecting Natural Resources and Preserving Productive Farms - Commission on the Development of a Blueprint for Solar Energy in Maryland
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0876 (HB1309)
Title
Aquaculture - Leases in Water Column - Riparian Right of First Refusal
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0939 /CH0237 (HB0028/CH0236)
Title
Natural Resources - Shellfish Nursery Operations - Wetlands License Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0028 /CH0236 (SB0939/CH0237) Natural Resources - Shellfish Nursery Operations - Wetlands License Requirements Delegate Clark 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 236
Environment and Transportation
1/30/2019 - 2:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0406 /CH0362 Wetlands and Waterways Program - State-Owned Lakes - Structural Shoreline Stabilization Delegate Beitzel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 362
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0532 (SB0744) Protecting Natural Resources and Preserving Productive Farms – Commission on the Development of a Blueprint for Solar Energy in Maryland Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0669 (SB0387) Environment - Water Quality Certifications (Pipeline and Water Protection Act of 2019) Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB0703 /CH0517 (SB0505/CH0518) Environmental Violations - Reporting Requirements Delegate Lafferty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 517
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0841 /CH0238 Aquaculture - Submerged Aquatic Vegetation - Placement of Shellfish, Bags, Nets, and Structures Delegate Clark 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1309 (SB0876) Aquaculture - Leases in Water Column - Riparian Right of First Refusal Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0387 (HB0669) Environment - Water Quality Certifications (Pipeline and Water Protection Act of 2019) Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs (Senator Young)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0505 /CH0518 (HB0703/CH0517) Environmental Violations - Reporting Requirements Senator Elfreth 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 518
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0744 (HB0532) Protecting Natural Resources and Preserving Productive Farms - Commission on the Development of a Blueprint for Solar Energy in Maryland Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/19/2019 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0876 (HB1309) Aquaculture - Leases in Water Column - Riparian Right of First Refusal Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 10:00 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2019 - 10:00 AM
SB0939 /CH0237 (HB0028/CH0236) Natural Resources - Shellfish Nursery Operations - Wetlands License Requirements Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/12/2019 - 10:00 AM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:38 PM