Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Wicomico County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0083 (SB0239/CH0034)
Title
Judgeships - Court of Special Appeals, Circuit Courts, and District Court
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0275 /CH0461 (SB0349/CH0460)
Title
Wicomico County Liquor Act of 2013
Sponsor
Wicomico County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0472 /CH0119
Title
Local Government Article
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0957 /CH0657
Title
Housing - Accessible Housing for Senior Homeowners, Older Adults, and Individuals with Disabilities
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1163
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2003 - Wicomico County - Salisbury City Park
Sponsor
Delegate Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1165 (SB0941)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - YMCA of the Chesapeake
Sponsor
Delegate Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934)
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Jones
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0239 /CH0034 (HB0083)
Title
Judgeships - Court of Special Appeals, Circuit Courts, and District Court
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0349 /CH0460 (HB0275/CH0461)
Title
Wicomico County Liquor Act of 2013
Sponsor
Senator Colburn
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0789
Title
Procurement - Preferences - Rural County Business Enterprise Participation
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0941 (HB1165)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - YMCA of the Chesapeake
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0083 (SB0239/CH0034) Judgeships - Court of Special Appeals, Circuit Courts, and District Court Speaker 6 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Judiciary
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Budget and Taxation
HB0275 /CH0461 (SB0349/CH0460) Wicomico County Liquor Act of 2013 Wicomico County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 461
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0472 /CH0119 Local Government Article Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0957 /CH0657 Housing - Accessible Housing for Senior Homeowners, Older Adults, and Individuals with Disabilities Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 657
Environmental Matters
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1163 Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2003 - Wicomico County - Salisbury City Park Delegate Conway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1165 (SB0941) Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - YMCA of the Chesapeake Delegate Conway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1372 /CH0430 (SB0934) Prior Authorizations of State Debt to Fund Capital Projects - Alterations Delegate Jones 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 430
Appropriations
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0239 /CH0034 (HB0083) Judgeships - Court of Special Appeals, Circuit Courts, and District Court President 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 34
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Judiciary
3/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0349 /CH0460 (HB0275/CH0461) Wicomico County Liquor Act of 2013 Senator Colburn 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 460
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0789 Procurement - Preferences - Rural County Business Enterprise Participation Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0941 (HB1165) Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - YMCA of the Chesapeake Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2013 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM