Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Wicomico County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0204
Title
Community Colleges - Small Community Colleges - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0672 (SB0920)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - Lower Shore Clinic Day Program for Seniors with Disabilities Facility
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0768 (SB0917/CH0353)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling Permit
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0894
Title
Wicomico County - Deer Hunting - Sundays
Sponsor
Wicomico County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0897 (SB0684)
Title
Liquor Board Reform Act of 2017
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1111 (SB0953)
Title
Natural Resources - Eastern Shore - Deer Firearms Season
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0020
Title
Wicomico County - Vehicle Dealer's Licenses - Motor Home and Travel Trailer Shows
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0684 (HB0897)
Title
Liquor Board Reform Act of 2017
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0920 (HB0672)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - Lower Shore Clinic Day Program for Seniors with Disabilities Facility
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0204 Community Colleges - Small Community Colleges - Funding Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0672 (SB0920) Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - Lower Shore Clinic Day Program for Seniors with Disabilities Facility Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/13/2017 - 11:30 AM
HB0768 (SB0917/CH0353) Motor Vehicles - Seasonal Exceptional Poultry Hauling Permit Delegate Otto 2 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0)
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0894 Wicomico County - Deer Hunting - Sundays Wicomico County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2017 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/04/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0897 (SB0684) Liquor Board Reform Act of 2017 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/20/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1111 (SB0953) Natural Resources - Eastern Shore - Deer Firearms Season Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
SB0020 Wicomico County - Vehicle Dealer's Licenses - Motor Home and Travel Trailer Shows Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/17/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0684 (HB0897) Liquor Board Reform Act of 2017 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0920 (HB0672) Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - Lower Shore Clinic Day Program for Seniors with Disabilities Facility Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 10:00 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/13/2017 - 10:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:54 PM