Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Wicomico County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1586 /CH0088 (SB0355/CH0087)
Title
Wicomico County - Motorcycles - Sunday Sales
Sponsor
Delegate Anderton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1595
Title
Education - Per Pupil Adequacy Target Grant - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1780 (SB1215)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - Rotary Labyrinth
Sponsor
Delegate Sample-Hughes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0355 /CH0087 (HB1586/CH0088)
Title
Wicomico County - Motorcycles - Sunday Sales
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1215 (HB1780)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - Rotary Labyrinth
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB1586 /CH0088 (SB0355/CH0087) Wicomico County - Motorcycles - Sunday Sales Delegate Anderton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 88
Economic Matters
3/12/2018 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
HB1595 Education - Per Pupil Adequacy Target Grant - Established Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m. (Ways and Means)
Ways and Means
3/08/2018 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1780 (SB1215) Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - Rotary Labyrinth Delegate Sample-Hughes 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 10:00 AM
SB0355 /CH0087 (HB1586/CH0088) Wicomico County - Motorcycles - Sunday Sales Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 87
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/06/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1215 (HB1780) Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - Rotary Labyrinth Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:59 PM