Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Wicomico County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0102 (SB0442)
Title
Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges - County Government Consent Requirement - Expansion
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0197 /CH0588 (SB0019/CH0589)
Title
Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Bed and Breakfast License
Sponsor
Wicomico County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0198 /CH0590 (SB0006/CH0591)
Title
Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Basket of Cheer Permit
Sponsor
Wicomico County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0199 /CH0592
Title
Wicomico County - Deer Hunting - Sundays
Sponsor
Wicomico County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0200
Title
Wicomico County – Sales and Use Tax Exemption – Aircraft Parts and Equipment
Sponsor
Wicomico County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0212 (SB0107)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges and Chesapeake Bay Crossing - Consent Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0840
Title
Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1218
Title
Wicomico County - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Procedures
Sponsor
Wicomico County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1358
Title
Natural Resources - Oyster Severance Tax - Increase
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0006 /CH0591 (HB0198/CH0590)
Title
Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Basket of Cheer Permit
Sponsor
Wicomico County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0019 /CH0589 (HB0197/CH0588)
Title
Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Bed and Breakfast License
Sponsor
Wicomico County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0107 (HB0212)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges and Chesapeake Bay Crossing - Consent Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0442 (HB0102)
Title
Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges - County Government Consent Requirement - Expansion
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0581 /CH0211 (HB1260)
Title
Economic, Housing, and Community Development – Opportunity Zone Incentives
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0102 (SB0442) Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges - County Government Consent Requirement - Expansion Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0197 /CH0588 (SB0019/CH0589) Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Bed and Breakfast License Wicomico County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 588
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0198 /CH0590 (SB0006/CH0591) Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Basket of Cheer Permit Wicomico County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 590
Economic Matters
2/18/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0199 /CH0592 Wicomico County - Deer Hunting - Sundays Wicomico County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 592
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2019 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0200 Wicomico County – Sales and Use Tax Exemption – Aircraft Parts and Equipment Wicomico County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/06/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0212 (SB0107) Anne Arundel County - Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges and Chesapeake Bay Crossing - Consent Requirement Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB0840 Environment - On-Site Wastewater Services - Regulation Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
HB1218 Wicomico County - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Procedures Wicomico County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2019 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2019 - 12:00 PM
HB1358 Natural Resources - Oyster Severance Tax - Increase Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0006 /CH0591 (HB0198/CH0590) Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Basket of Cheer Permit Wicomico County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 591
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0019 /CH0589 (HB0197/CH0588) Wicomico County - Alcoholic Beverages - Bed and Breakfast License Wicomico County Senators 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 589
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2019 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0107 (HB0212) Anne Arundel County - Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges and Chesapeake Bay Crossing - Consent Requirement Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/13/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0442 (HB0102) Toll Roads, Highways, and Bridges - County Government Consent Requirement - Expansion Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/27/2019 - 1:00 PM
SB0581 /CH0211 (HB1260) Economic, Housing, and Community Development – Opportunity Zone Incentives Senator Ferguson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 211
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2019 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/02/2019 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:39 PM