Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Wildlands

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0296 /CH0465 (SB0336)
Title
Natural Resources - Wildlands - Designation of New Wildlands
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0420 (SB0471/CH0505)
Title
Washington County - Off-Road Vehicle Trails - Prohibition of Establishment on Sideling Hill
Sponsor
Delegate Myers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0336 (HB0296/CH0465)
Title
Natural Resources - Wildlands - Designation of New Wildlands
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0471 /CH0505 (HB0420)
Title
Washington County - Off-Road Vehicle Trails - Prohibition of Establishment on Sideling Hill
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0296 /CH0465 (SB0336) Natural Resources - Wildlands - Designation of New Wildlands Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 465
Environmental Matters
2/05/2014 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0420 (SB0471/CH0505) Washington County - Off-Road Vehicle Trails - Prohibition of Establishment on Sideling Hill Delegate Myers 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Environmental Matters
2/12/2014 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0336 (HB0296/CH0465) Natural Resources - Wildlands - Designation of New Wildlands President 3 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0471 /CH0505 (HB0420) Washington County - Off-Road Vehicle Trails - Prohibition of Establishment on Sideling Hill Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 505
Judicial Proceedings
2/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:46 PM