Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Wiretapping

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0308
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement Officers - Video Cameras
Sponsor
Delegate Conaway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0533 /CH0129 (SB0628)
Title
Public Safety - Law Enforcement Officers - Body-Worn Digital Recording Device and Electronic Control Device
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0866
Title
Wiretapping and Electronic Surveillance - Law Enforcement and Public Transportation - One-Party Consent for Interception of Oral Communications
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0628 (HB0533/CH0129)
Title
Wiretapping and Electronic Surveillance - Body-Worn Digital Recording Device and Electronic Control Device - Exception
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0308 Public Safety - Law Enforcement Officers - Video Cameras Delegate Conaway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0533 /CH0129 (SB0628) Public Safety - Law Enforcement Officers - Body-Worn Digital Recording Device and Electronic Control Device Delegate Sydnor 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 129
Judiciary
3/12/2015 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/07/2015 - 1:00 PM
HB0866 Wiretapping and Electronic Surveillance - Law Enforcement and Public Transportation - One-Party Consent for Interception of Oral Communications Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
3/17/2015 - 1:00 PM
SB0628 (HB0533/CH0129) Wiretapping and Electronic Surveillance - Body-Worn Digital Recording Device and Electronic Control Device - Exception Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/26/2015 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM