Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Witnesses

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0589
Title
Firearms Freedom Act
Sponsor
Delegate Dwyer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0652 (SB0817)
Title
Criminal Law - Informants - Identity of Minors
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0723 /CH0274 (SB0460/CH0273)
Title
Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Authority to Practice
Sponsor
Delegate Tarrant
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0765 (SB0959)
Title
Drugged Driving - Drug Recognition Expert - Testimony
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1037 (SB0630)
Title
Evidence - Testimony by Spouse - Violation of Protective Order
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1103
Title
Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Expansion and Modifications
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1112 (SB0556)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Persons Committed as Not Criminally Responsible - Release
Sponsor
Delegate Mitchell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1304 (SB0661)
Title
Privileged Communications - Critical Incident Stress Management and Peer Support
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1499 /CH0419 (SB1039)
Title
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0043
Title
Courts - Evidence - Vehicle Repair Estimates
Sponsor
Senator Zirkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0460 /CH0273 (HB0723/CH0274)
Title
Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Authority to Practice
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0556 (HB1112)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Persons Committed as Not Criminally Responsible - Release
Sponsor
Senator Stone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0630 (HB1037)
Title
Evidence - Testimony by Spouse - Violation of Protective Order
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0661 (HB1304)
Title
Privileged Communications - Critical Incident Stress Management and Peer Support
Sponsor
Senator Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0817 (HB0652)
Title
Criminal Law - Informants - Identity of Minors
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0959 (HB0765)
Title
Drugged Driving - Drug Recognition Expert - Testimony
Sponsor
Senator Getty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1039 (HB1499/CH0419)
Title
Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0589 Firearms Freedom Act Delegate Dwyer 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB0652 (SB0817) Criminal Law - Informants - Identity of Minors Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0723 /CH0274 (SB0460/CH0273) Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Authority to Practice Delegate Tarrant 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 274
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0765 (SB0959) Drugged Driving - Drug Recognition Expert - Testimony Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1037 (SB0630) Evidence - Testimony by Spouse - Violation of Protective Order Delegate Clippinger 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1103 Speed Monitoring and Work Zone Speed Control Systems - Expansion and Modifications Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters; Withdrawn
Environmental Matters
HB1112 (SB0556) Criminal Procedure - Persons Committed as Not Criminally Responsible - Release Delegate Mitchell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/26/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1304 (SB0661) Privileged Communications - Critical Incident Stress Management and Peer Support Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
3/06/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1499 /CH0419 (SB1039) Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013 Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 419
Ways and Means
3/13/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0043 Courts - Evidence - Vehicle Repair Estimates Senator Zirkin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2013 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
3/28/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0460 /CH0273 (HB0723/CH0274) Health Occupations - Physician Assistants - Authority to Practice Senator Conway 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 273
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0556 (HB1112) Criminal Procedure - Persons Committed as Not Criminally Responsible - Release Senator Stone 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0630 (HB1037) Evidence - Testimony by Spouse - Violation of Protective Order Senator King 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0661 (HB1304) Privileged Communications - Critical Incident Stress Management and Peer Support Senator Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
2/19/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0817 (HB0652) Criminal Law - Informants - Identity of Minors Senator Shank 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0959 (HB0765) Drugged Driving - Drug Recognition Expert - Testimony Senator Getty 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB1039 (HB1499/CH0419) Campaign Finance Reform Act of 2013 President 6 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM