Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Witnesses

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0188 /CH0667
Title
Public Health - Advance Directives - Witness Requirements, Advance Directives Services, and Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Morhaim
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0370 (SB0354)
Title
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act
Sponsor
Delegate Pendergrass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0483
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victims and Witnesses - Out of Court Statement of Child Victim
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson, B.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0823 /CH0083 (SB0448/CH0082)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Small Procurements - Medical Evaluations for Disability Retirement Benefits
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes, B.
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0881
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers, Correctional Officers, and First Responders
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1208 (SB0616)
Title
Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness
Sponsor
Delegate Morales
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1409
Title
Courts - Law Enforcement Officer as Witness - Prohibition on Postponement for Inability to Appear
Sponsor
Delegate Glass
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1519 (SB0471)
Title
Morgan State University - Task Force on Reconciliation and Equity
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0024 /CH0008
Title
Public Safety - Eyewitness Identification Policies - Repeal of Submission Requirement
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0077 /CH0196
Title
Anne Arundel County and Harford County - Courthouse Dog and Child Witness Pilot Program
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0354 (HB0370)
Title
Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0448 /CH0082 (HB0823/CH0083)
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Small Procurements - Medical Evaluations for Disability Retirement Benefits
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0471 (HB1519)
Title
Morgan State University - Task Force on Reconciliation and Equity
Sponsor
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0616 (HB1208)
Title
Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0958
Title
Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1037
Title
Health Care Malpractice Qualified Expert - Limitation on Testimony in Personal Injury Claims - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Ramirez
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0188 /CH0667 Public Health - Advance Directives - Witness Requirements, Advance Directives Services, and Fund Delegate Morhaim 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 667
Health and Government Operations
2/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0370 (SB0354) Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act Delegate Pendergrass 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations)
Health and Government Operations
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
HB0483 Criminal Procedure - Victims and Witnesses - Out of Court Statement of Child Victim Delegate Wilson, B. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/14/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB0823 /CH0083 (SB0448/CH0082) State Retirement and Pension System - Small Procurements - Medical Evaluations for Disability Retirement Benefits Delegate Barnes, B. 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 83
Appropriations
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2017 - 9:00 AM
HB0881 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers, Correctional Officers, and First Responders Delegate Malone 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
HB1208 (SB0616) Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness Delegate Morales 2 2 In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Ramirez)
Judiciary
2/28/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1409 Courts - Law Enforcement Officer as Witness - Prohibition on Postponement for Inability to Appear Delegate Glass 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
HB1519 (SB0471) Morgan State University - Task Force on Reconciliation and Equity Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
3/07/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0024 /CH0008 Public Safety - Eyewitness Identification Policies - Repeal of Submission Requirement Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 8
Judicial Proceedings
1/18/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0077 /CH0196 Anne Arundel County and Harford County - Courthouse Dog and Child Witness Pilot Program Senator Simonaire 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 196
Judicial Proceedings
1/24/2017 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0354 (HB0370) Richard E. Israel and Roger "Pip" Moyer End-of-Life Option Act Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0448 /CH0082 (HB0823/CH0083) State Retirement and Pension System - Small Procurements - Medical Evaluations for Disability Retirement Benefits Senator Guzzone 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 82
Budget and Taxation
2/16/2017 - 9:00 AM
Appropriations
3/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0471 (HB1519) Morgan State University - Task Force on Reconciliation and Equity Senator Nathan-Pulliam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0616 (HB1208) Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB0958 Criminal Law - Death Penalty - Law Enforcement Officers and First Responders Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2017 - 1:00 PM
SB1037 Health Care Malpractice Qualified Expert - Limitation on Testimony in Personal Injury Claims - Repeal Senator Ramirez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2017 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:54 PM