Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Women

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0027 /CH0212 (SB0656)
Title
Correctional Services - Healthy Births for Incarcerated Women Act
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0088 (SB0281)
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Selective Service Registration - Driver's License and Identification Card Applicants
Sponsor
Delegate Schuh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0236 (SB0208)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0283 (SB0034)
Title
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0358 (SB0270)
Title
Law Enforcement Personnel - Training - Human Trafficking Offenses
Sponsor
Delegate Schuh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0459 /CH0099
Title
Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician Assistants
Sponsor
Chair, Ways and Means Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0792 (SB0695)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Dental Services for Postpartum Women - Coverage
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0986 (SB0951)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - YWCA Domestic Violence Safe House
Sponsor
Delegate Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1211
Title
State Board of Nursing - Midwives - Licensing and Regulation
Sponsor
Delegate Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1332 /CH0653
Title
Task Force to Study Sports Injuries in High School Female Athletes
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1349 /CH0249 (SB0868)
Title
Public Safety Diversity Act of 2014
Sponsor
Delegate Braveboy
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1544
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Serving Women Now Foundation Project
Sponsor
Delegate Niemann
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0034 (HB0283)
Title
Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0085
Title
Health - Medical Procedures - Ultrasound Options
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0208 (HB0236)
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0270 (HB0358)
Title
Law Enforcement Personnel - Training - Human Trafficking Offenses
Sponsor
Senator Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0281 (HB0088)
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Selective Service Registration - Driver's License and Identification Card Applicants
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0656 (HB0027/CH0212)
Title
Correctional Services - Healthy Births for Incarcerated Women Act
Sponsor
Senator Raskin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0695 (HB0792)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Dental Services for Postpartum Women - Coverage
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0868 (HB1349/CH0249)
Title
Public Safety Diversity Act of 2014
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0944
Title
Family Law - Controlled Dangerous Substance Use During Pregnancy and Substance-Exposed Newborns - Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Shank
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0951 (HB0986)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - YWCA Domestic Violence Safe House
Sponsor
Senator Astle
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SJ0002
Title
Acknowledgment of the Sufferings of Sexually Enslaved Women ("Comfort Women") During World War II
Sponsor
Senator Manno
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0027 /CH0212 (SB0656) Correctional Services - Healthy Births for Incarcerated Women Act Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212
Judiciary
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0088 (SB0281) Motor Vehicle Administration - Selective Service Registration - Driver's License and Identification Card Applicants Delegate Schuh 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Environmental Matters
1/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0236 (SB0208) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary; Withdrawn
Judiciary
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0283 (SB0034) Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/10/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0358 (SB0270) Law Enforcement Personnel - Training - Human Trafficking Offenses Delegate Schuh 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0459 /CH0099 Maryland Loan Assistance Repayment Program for Physicians and Physician Assistants Chair, Ways and Means Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99
Ways and Means
3/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/27/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0792 (SB0695) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Dental Services for Postpartum Women - Coverage Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0986 (SB0951) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - YWCA Domestic Violence Safe House Delegate Beidle 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Appropriations
HB1211 State Board of Nursing - Midwives - Licensing and Regulation Delegate Kelly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1332 /CH0653 Task Force to Study Sports Injuries in High School Female Athletes Delegate Dumais 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 653
Ways and Means
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1349 /CH0249 (SB0868) Public Safety Diversity Act of 2014 Delegate Braveboy 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 249
Health and Government Operations
2/26/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Finance
4/02/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB1544 Creation of a State Debt - Prince George's County - Serving Women Now Foundation Project Delegate Niemann 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 4:00 PM
SB0034 (HB0283) Pain-Capable Unborn Child Protection Act Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0085 Health - Medical Procedures - Ultrasound Options Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/12/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0208 (HB0236) Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act Senator Kelley 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0270 (HB0358) Law Enforcement Personnel - Training - Human Trafficking Offenses Senator Jacobs 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0281 (HB0088) Motor Vehicle Administration - Selective Service Registration - Driver's License and Identification Card Applicants Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0656 (HB0027/CH0212) Correctional Services - Healthy Births for Incarcerated Women Act Senator Raskin 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0695 (HB0792) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Dental Services for Postpartum Women - Coverage Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0868 (HB1349/CH0249) Public Safety Diversity Act of 2014 Senator Benson 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/13/2014 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0944 Family Law - Controlled Dangerous Substance Use During Pregnancy and Substance-Exposed Newborns - Reporting Senator Shank 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Judicial Proceedings
SB0951 (HB0986) Creation of a State Debt - Anne Arundel County - YWCA Domestic Violence Safe House Senator Astle 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; Withdrawn
Rules
SJ0002 Acknowledgment of the Sufferings of Sexually Enslaved Women ("Comfort Women") During World War II Senator Manno 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/28/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:46 PM