Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Worcester County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0472 /CH0119
Title
Local Government Article
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0999
Title
Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages
Sponsor
Worcester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1164 (SB0773)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Worcester County - Diakonia Housing Expansion
Sponsor
Delegate Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1366
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Class CS Chain Store Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Barnes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0472 (HB1179)
Title
Worcester County - Motor Scooters and Mopeds - Special Dealer Decals
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0773 (HB1164)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Worcester County - Diakonia Housing Expansion
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0789
Title
Procurement - Preferences - Rural County Business Enterprise Participation
Sponsor
Senator Pipkin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0949 /CH0584
Title
Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0472 /CH0119 Local Government Article Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB0999 Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages Worcester County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Economic Matters
2/25/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1164 (SB0773) Creation of a State Debt - Worcester County - Diakonia Housing Expansion Delegate Conway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/09/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1366 Alcoholic Beverages - Class CS Chain Store Licenses Delegate Barnes 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Economic Matters
SB0472 (HB1179) Worcester County - Motor Scooters and Mopeds - Special Dealer Decals Senator Mathias 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0773 (HB1164) Creation of a State Debt - Worcester County - Diakonia Housing Expansion Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2013 - 12:00 PM
SB0789 Procurement - Preferences - Rural County Business Enterprise Participation Senator Pipkin 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/07/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0949 /CH0584 Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 584
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2013 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:44 PM