Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Worcester County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0296 /CH0465 (SB0336)
Title
Natural Resources - Wildlands - Designation of New Wildlands
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0367 (SB0441/CH0060)
Title
Worcester County - Bingo Board - Repeal
Sponsor
Worcester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0757 (SB0938)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - Tri-County Multi-Purpose Center
Sponsor
Delegate Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0794 /CH0425 (SB0794)
Title
Maryland Unaccompanied Homeless Youth and Young Adult Count Demonstration Project
Sponsor
Delegate Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1512
Title
Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1535
Title
Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Town of Berlin
Sponsor
Delegate McDermott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0336 (HB0296/CH0465)
Title
Natural Resources - Wildlands - Designation of New Wildlands
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0441 /CH0060 (HB0367)
Title
Worcester County - Bingo Board - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0794 (HB0794/CH0425)
Title
Maryland Unaccompanied Homeless Youth and Young Adult Count Demonstration Project
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0938 (HB0757)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - Tri-County Multi-Purpose Center
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1079 /CH0373
Title
Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0296 /CH0465 (SB0336) Natural Resources - Wildlands - Designation of New Wildlands Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 465
Environmental Matters
2/05/2014 - 2:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0367 (SB0441/CH0060) Worcester County - Bingo Board - Repeal Worcester County Delegation 4 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Ways and Means
2/11/2014 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
HB0757 (SB0938) Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - Tri-County Multi-Purpose Center Delegate Conway 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/08/2014 - 2:00 PM
HB0794 /CH0425 (SB0794) Maryland Unaccompanied Homeless Youth and Young Adult Count Demonstration Project Delegate Washington, M. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 425
Appropriations
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1512 Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
HB1535 Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Town of Berlin Delegate McDermott 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
SB0336 (HB0296/CH0465) Natural Resources - Wildlands - Designation of New Wildlands President 3 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Environmental Matters
3/19/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0441 /CH0060 (HB0367) Worcester County - Bingo Board - Repeal Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 60
Budget and Taxation
2/05/2014 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0794 (HB0794/CH0425) Maryland Unaccompanied Homeless Youth and Young Adult Count Demonstration Project Senator Reilly 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2014 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/25/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB0938 (HB0757) Creation of a State Debt - Wicomico County - Tri-County Multi-Purpose Center Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/08/2014 - 1:00 PM
SB1079 /CH0373 Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 373
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/18/2014 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/01/2014 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:46 PM