Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Worcester County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0126 (SB0131)
Title
Worcester County - Recycling at Special Events - Exemptions
Sponsor
Delegate Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0299 (SB0130/CH0050)
Title
Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container Permit for Draft Beer
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0349 /CH0717 (SB1162)
Title
Baltimore County - Education - Career Exploration and Development Activities - Coffee (Java Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Grammer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0526 (SB0747)
Title
Community Colleges - Small Community Colleges - Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0697 /CH0112
Title
Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1097 (SB0729)
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program
Sponsor
Eastern Shore Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1572 (SB1033/CH0237)
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2015 and 2016
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1573 (SB1034)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Worcester County - Delmarva Discovery Center and Museum
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0130 /CH0050 (HB0299)
Title
Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container Permit for Draft Beer
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0131 (HB0126)
Title
Worcester County - Recycling at Special Events - Exemptions
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0728 (HB1143)
Title
Income Tax Credit - New Dwellings - Automatic Fire Sprinkler Systems
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0729 (HB1097)
Title
Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0737
Title
Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0738
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0747 (HB0526)
Title
Community Colleges - Small Community Colleges - Funding
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0941 /CH0595
Title
Worcester County - Family Entertainment Centers - Amusement Gaming Licenses
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0967 /CH0113
Title
Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1033 /CH0237 (HB1572)
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2015 - Worcester County - Delmarva Discovery Center and Museum
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1034 (HB1573)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Worcester County - Delmarva Discovery Center and Museum
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1061
Title
Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting - Statewide Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Conway
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0126 (SB0131) Worcester County - Recycling at Special Events - Exemptions Delegate Carozza 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Environment and Transportation
HB0299 (SB0130/CH0050) Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container Permit for Draft Beer Delegate Otto 2 2 Veto sustained (0-135)
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0349 /CH0717 (SB1162) Baltimore County - Education - Career Exploration and Development Activities - Coffee (Java Act) Delegate Grammer 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 717
Ways and Means
2/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0526 (SB0747) Community Colleges - Small Community Colleges - Funding Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
2/16/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB0697 /CH0112 Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A Beer, Wine, and Liquor License Delegate Otto 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 112
Economic Matters
2/22/2016 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1097 (SB0729) Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program Eastern Shore Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2016 - 1:00 PM
HB1572 (SB1033/CH0237) Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loans of 2015 and 2016 Delegate Otto 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Appropriations
4/09/2016 - 9:30 AM
Budget and Taxation
HB1573 (SB1034) Creation of a State Debt - Worcester County - Delmarva Discovery Center and Museum Delegate Otto 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/14/2016 - 9:00 AM
SB0130 /CH0050 (HB0299) Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Refillable Container Permit for Draft Beer Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 50
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/26/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0131 (HB0126) Worcester County - Recycling at Special Events - Exemptions Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0728 (HB1143) Income Tax Credit - New Dwellings - Automatic Fire Sprinkler Systems Senator Mathias 2 2 In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
4/11/2016 - 9:00 AM
SB0729 (HB1097) Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Eastern Shore Counties - Warrant Intercept Program Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/11/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0737 Economic Development - Rural Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2016 - 2:30 PM
SB0738 Economic Development - Maryland Economic Development Program and One Maryland Tax Credit Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2016 - 2:30 PM
SB0747 (HB0526) Community Colleges - Small Community Colleges - Funding Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 2:30 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2016 - 2:30 PM
SB0941 /CH0595 Worcester County - Family Entertainment Centers - Amusement Gaming Licenses Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 595
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/29/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB0967 /CH0113 Worcester County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class A Beer, Wine, and Liquor License Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 113
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2016 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB1033 /CH0237 (HB1572) Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2015 - Worcester County - Delmarva Discovery Center and Museum Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2016 - 3:00 PM
Appropriations
3/15/2016 - 1:00 PM
SB1034 (HB1573) Creation of a State Debt - Worcester County - Delmarva Discovery Center and Museum Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 10:30 a.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/14/2016 - 10:30 AM
SB1061 Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting - Statewide Authorization Senator Conway 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:52 PM