Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Worcester County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0673 (SB0022)
Title
Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment
Sponsor
Delegate Barron
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1406 (SB0872/CH0325)
Title
Vehicle Laws – Special Event Zones – Worcester County
Sponsor
Delegate Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1773 (SB1174)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Worcester County - Pocomoke Little League
Sponsor
Delegate Otto
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0022 (HB0673)
Title
Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0872 /CH0325 (HB1406)
Title
Vehicle Laws – Special Event Zones – Worcester County
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1169
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Worcester County - Delmarva Discovery Center and Museum
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1170
Title
Creation of a State Debt – Worcester County – Macky and Pam Stansell House of Coastal Hospice at the Ocean
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1174 (HB1773)
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Worcester County - Pocomoke Little League
Sponsor
Senator Mathias
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0673 (SB0022) Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment Delegate Barron 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Judiciary
Judiciary
2/14/2018 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1406 (SB0872/CH0325) Vehicle Laws – Special Event Zones – Worcester County Delegate Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1773 (SB1174) Creation of a State Debt - Worcester County - Pocomoke Little League Delegate Otto 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/10/2018 - 10:00 AM
SB0022 (HB0673) Debt Collection - Exemptions From Attachment Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/07/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0872 /CH0325 (HB1406) Vehicle Laws – Special Event Zones – Worcester County Senator Mathias 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 325
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB1169 Creation of a State Debt - Worcester County - Delmarva Discovery Center and Museum Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 2:00 PM
SB1170 Creation of a State Debt – Worcester County – Macky and Pam Stansell House of Coastal Hospice at the Ocean Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 2:00 PM
SB1174 (HB1773) Creation of a State Debt - Worcester County - Pocomoke Little League Senator Mathias 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2018 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:59 PM