Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Wreckers and Scrap Processors

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0279 (SB0725)
Title
Business Regulation - Junk Dealers and Scrap Metal Processors - Holding Period for Junk and Scrap Metal
Sponsor
Delegate Schuh
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0472 /CH0119
Title
Local Government Article
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1144
Title
Junk Dealers and Scrap Metal Processors - Shopping Carts and Metal Piping
Sponsor
Delegate Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1488
Title
Vehicle Laws - Towing Companies - Disposal of Abandoned Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Smigiel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0725 (HB0279)
Title
Business Regulation - Junk Dealers and Scrap Metal Processors - Holding Period for Junk and Scrap Metal
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0279 (SB0725) Business Regulation - Junk Dealers and Scrap Metal Processors - Holding Period for Junk and Scrap Metal Delegate Schuh 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/07/2013 - 2:00 PM
HB0472 /CH0119 Local Government Article Speaker 6 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 119
Environmental Matters
2/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/21/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1144 Junk Dealers and Scrap Metal Processors - Shopping Carts and Metal Piping Delegate Carter 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/12/2013 - 1:00 PM
HB1488 Vehicle Laws - Towing Companies - Disposal of Abandoned Vehicles Delegate Smigiel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Environmental Matters
3/20/2013 - 1:00 PM
SB0725 (HB0279) Business Regulation - Junk Dealers and Scrap Metal Processors - Holding Period for Junk and Scrap Metal Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
3/14/2013 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:45 PM