Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Wrongful Death

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0289
Title
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages
Sponsor
Delegate Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1099 (SB0868)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Lafferty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0036
Title
Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0868 (HB1099)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Road User - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1150
Title
Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Death - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol Testing (Danshaun's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0289 Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages Delegate Sydnor 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Judiciary
1/31/2018 - 2:00 PM
HB1099 (SB0868) Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Individual - Penalties Delegate Lafferty 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
3/01/2018 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0036 Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages Senator Smith 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/16/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB0868 (HB1099) Vehicle Laws - Injury or Death of Vulnerable Road User - Penalties Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/27/2018 - 1:00 PM
SB1150 Vehicle Laws - Accidents Resulting in Death - Mandatory Drug and Alcohol Testing (Danshaun's Law) Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/15/2018 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 10/15/2019 3:59 PM