Committee Testimony and Witness Signup
SB0257 - Election Law - Notice to Permanent Absentee Voters
Education, Energy, and the Environment 2/5/2025 2:00:00 PM
Ways and Means 3/18/2025 1:00:00 PM
As of: 5/9/2025 10:29:53 AM
Name | Organization | Position | Testimony | Committee |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Comm, Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Comm | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
EEE | |
Lang, Alan | FAV | 2025 SB0257 Testimony For 2025-02-05.pdf | EEE | |
Gudger, John Michael | Maryland Association of Election Officials | FAV | Final - SB257 - 2025.docx.pdf | EEE |
DeMarinis, Jared | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony SBE Testimony SB257:HB199.pdf |
EEE | |
Testimony, All | N/A | Merged Testimony as of 2-4-2025 at 959 AM | EEE | |
Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Comm, Chair, Education, Energy, and the Environment Comm | FAV |
In Person - Oral Testimony |
W&M | |
Lang, Alan | FAV | 2025 SB0257 Testimony For 2025-03-18.pdf | W&M |
Validation
Please fix the following:
MyMGA
Accessibility Tools