Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 2/19/2020 12:06:58 PM
Thursday, January 9, 2020
Senate
Created: 12/19/2019 4:56 PM
Budget and Taxation Committee
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Organizational Meeting

Canceled
Budget and Taxation Committee
2:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Bill hearing on selected pre-filed bills.

Created: 12/19/2019 5:02 PM
Budget and Taxation Committee - Bill Hearing
2:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Chr B&T (Dept)

Maryland Green Building Council - Membership
Sen Young

Small Business Fairness Act
Sen Lam

Sales and Use Tax - Diapers - Exemption
Chr B&T (Dept)

Property Tax - Homeowners' and Renters' Property Tax Credits - Deadlines
Sen Young

State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations ("Slots" for Homeless Veterans Act)
Chr B&T (Dept)

Gaming - Video Lottery Facilities and Licenses - Definitions
Sen Ellis

Southern Maryland Rapid Transit Project - Requirements and Funding
Chr B&T (Dept)

Annual and Personal Property Reports - Submission

Created: 1/2/2020 12:40 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Work Session
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Organizational Meeting

Created: 1/2/2020 10:44 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Bill Hearing
1:30 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
2:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Chr EHE (Dept)

State Real Estate Commission - Sunset Extension
Chr EHE (Dept)

State Board of Pilots - Sunset Extension
Chr EHE (Dept)

Maryland Home Improvement Commission - Sunset Extension

Created: 12/16/2019 12:20 PM
Finance Committee
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Organizational Meeting

Created: 12/19/2019 4:01 PM
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
1:30 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
1:45 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Chr FIN (Dept)

Department of Human Services - Food Supplement Program - Renaming
Chr FIN (Dept)

Insurance - Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund - Notice of Cancellation
Chr FIN (Dept)

Management of eMaryland Marketplace

Created: 1/3/2020 11:45 AM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Organizational Meeting

Created: 1/3/2020 11:45 AM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
2:15 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Bill Hearings will begin immediately following the Organizational Meeting
Sen Simonaire, et al

Anne Arundel County – Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law – Adoption of Local Ordinance
Sen Hayes

Abandoned Property in Possession of a Museum
Sen Simonaire, et al

Courts - Court Dog and Child Witness Program - Established

House
Created: 1/7/2020 10:44 AM
Appropriations Committee
1:30 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Organizational Meeting

Created: 1/3/2020 1:02 PM
Economic Matters Committee - Work Session
11:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
or immediately following floor session
Organizational Meeting

Created: 1/2/2020 11:05 AM
Environment and Transportation Committee
10:30 AM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
11:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
Committee Organizational Meeting

Created: 1/7/2020 2:32 PM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
Organizational Meeting

Created: 1/7/2020 3:24 PM
Judiciary Committee
11:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
Organizational Meeting

Created: 1/7/2020 3:24 PM
Judiciary Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
Law Enforcement Officers – Public Information Workgroup

Created: 12/16/2019 3:08 PM
Ways and Means Committee
11:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Committee Organizational Meeting

Other
Juvenile Justice Reform Council
Created: 12/20/2019 12:22 PM
1:30 PM to 3:30 PM - The Alleghany College of Education, 12401 Willowbrook Road, SE, Cumberland, MD
Western Maryland Regional Listening Session

Created: 12/20/2019 12:23 PM
6:30 PM to 8:30 PM - The Alleghany College of Education, 12401 Willowbrook Road, SE, Cumberland, MD
Western Maryland Regional Listening Session

Student Data Privacy Council
Created: 10/23/2019 10:41 AM
9:00 AM - Harry Hughes Conference Center, MDOT Headquarters, 7201 Corporate Center Drive, Hanover, MD
Monthly Meeting