Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 1/18/2020 12:42:37 AM
Wednesday, January 15, 2020
Senate
Created: 1/6/2020 1:41 PM
Budget and Taxation Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Sen Reilly

Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Anne Arundel County - Warrant Intercept Program
Sens Kagan and Reilly

Public Safety - 9-1-1 Fees - Audits
Sen Hayes

Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit for Newly Constructed Dwellings - Reauthorization and Modification
Sen Ellis

Income Tax - Credit for Small Businesses - State Minimum Wage Increase
Sen Ellis

Income Tax - Credit for Qualified Commuters
Sen Eckardt

Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Exemption
Sen McCray

Economic Development - Opportunity Zone Incentives - Alteration of the More Jobs for Marylanders and Opportunity Zone Enhancement Programs
Sen Ellis

Disabled Active Duty Service Members, Disabled Veterans, and Surviving Spouses - Exemption From Property Tax and Other Charges and Refunds
(Removed - 1/14/2020 1:49 PM)
Sen Young

Income Tax Checkoff - Maryland Assault Weapons Buyback Fund
(Removed - 1/14/2020 5:45 PM)
Sen Patterson

Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Local Impact Grants - Reimbursement for Maryland Route 210 Projects
(Removed - 1/15/2020 2:50 PM)