Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 1/20/2020 9:56:27 PM
Wednesday, January 15, 2020
Senate
Created: 12/19/2019 4:55 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Full Committee Briefing
Briefing by the Commission on Environmental Justice and Sustainable Communities.

Created: 12/19/2019 4:58 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Briefing
1:30 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Full Committee Briefing
Briefing by the Maryland Port Administration

Created: 1/2/2020 12:40 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Briefing
2:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Department of Legislative Services - State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners Sunset Evaluation Update
Please note: the committee will accept limited public testimony following the presentation by the Department of Legislative Services.
(Added - 1/13/2020 6:47 PM)

Created: 1/2/2020 12:40 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Briefing
2:30 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Department of Legislative Services - State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists Sunset Evaluation Update

Created: 1/2/2020 10:44 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Bill Hearing
3:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Chr EHE (Dept)

Maryland Intrastate Emergency Management Assistance Compact
Chr EHE (Dept)

State Government - Emergency Management - Continuity Planning