Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 1/18/2020 1:08:20 AM
Wednesday, January 15, 2020
Senate
Created: 1/3/2020 11:45 AM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Sen Waldstreicher

Public Safety - Regulated Firearm - Definition
Sen Lam

Baltimore County - Vehicle Height Monitoring Systems
Sen Lee

State's Attorney - Required Disclosure - Facial Recognition and DNA Analysis and Search
(Added - 1/8/2020 1:02 PM)
Sen McCray

Baltimore City - Members of the Command Staff of the Police Department - Residency Requirements
Sen Eckardt

Motor Vehicle Registration – Exception for Golf Carts – Hoopers Island
Sen Lee

Criminal Procedure - Evidence - Causing Unavailability of Witness
(Removed - 1/9/2020 4:08 PM)