Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 9/30/2020 1:13:58 AM
Wednesday, January 15, 2020
Senate
Created: 1/6/2020 1:41 PM
Budget and Taxation Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Sen Reilly

Maryland Income Tax Refunds - Anne Arundel County - Warrant Intercept Program
Sens Kagan and Reilly

Public Safety - 9-1-1 Fees - Audits
Sen Hayes

Baltimore City - Property Tax Credit for Newly Constructed Dwellings - Reauthorization and Modification
Sen Ellis

Income Tax - Credit for Small Businesses - State Minimum Wage Increase
Sen Ellis

Income Tax - Credit for Qualified Commuters
Sen Eckardt

Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Exemption
Sen McCray

Economic Development - Opportunity Zone Incentives - Alteration of the More Jobs for Marylanders and Opportunity Zone Enhancement Programs
Sen Ellis

Disabled Active Duty Service Members, Disabled Veterans, and Surviving Spouses - Exemption From Property Tax and Other Charges and Refunds
(Removed - 1/14/2020 1:49 PM)
Sen Young

Income Tax Checkoff - Maryland Assault Weapons Buyback Fund
(Removed - 1/14/2020 5:45 PM)
Sen Patterson

Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Local Impact Grants - Reimbursement for Maryland Route 210 Projects
(Removed - 1/15/2020 2:50 PM)

Created: 12/19/2019 4:55 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Full Committee Briefing
Briefing by the Commission on Environmental Justice and Sustainable Communities.

Created: 12/19/2019 4:58 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Briefing
1:30 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Full Committee Briefing
Briefing by the Maryland Port Administration

Created: 1/2/2020 12:40 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Briefing
2:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Department of Legislative Services - State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners Sunset Evaluation Update
Please note: the committee will accept limited public testimony following the presentation by the Department of Legislative Services.
(Added - 1/13/2020 6:47 PM)

Created: 1/2/2020 12:40 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Briefing
2:30 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Department of Legislative Services - State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists Sunset Evaluation Update

Created: 1/2/2020 10:44 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Bill Hearing
3:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Chr EHE (Dept)

Maryland Intrastate Emergency Management Assistance Compact
Chr EHE (Dept)

State Government - Emergency Management - Continuity Planning

Created: 12/19/2019 4:07 PM
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Chr FIN (Dept)

Health Services Cost Review Commission - Duties and Reports - Revisions
Chr FIN (Dept)

Health Insurance - Technical Correction and Required Conformity With Federal Law
Chr FIN (Dept)

Health Insurance Benefit Cards, Prescription Benefit Cards, and Other Technology - Identification of Regulatory Agency
Chr FIN (Dept)

Health Insurance - Provider Panels - Definitions of Provider and Health Care Services

Created: 1/3/2020 11:45 AM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Sen Waldstreicher

Public Safety - Regulated Firearm - Definition
Sen Lam

Baltimore County - Vehicle Height Monitoring Systems
Sen Lee

State's Attorney - Required Disclosure - Facial Recognition and DNA Analysis and Search
(Added - 1/8/2020 1:02 PM)
Sen McCray

Baltimore City - Members of the Command Staff of the Police Department - Residency Requirements
Sen Eckardt

Motor Vehicle Registration – Exception for Golf Carts – Hoopers Island
Sen Lee

Criminal Procedure - Evidence - Causing Unavailability of Witness
(Removed - 1/9/2020 4:08 PM)

House
Created: 1/8/2020 11:21 AM
Appropriations Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Briefing by the Department of Legislative Services on Opioids

Created: 1/8/2020 1:38 PM
Appropriations Committee - Briefing
2:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
For Profit Colleges

Canceled
Economic Matters Committee - Briefing
10:30 AM - House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
or immediately following floor session
DNR: Power Plant Research Program
Required Reports: RPS, Nuclear Generation

Created: 1/14/2020 4:53 PM
Economic Matters Committee - Briefing
10:30 AM - House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
Briefing by the Office of Information Systems
Overview of the electronic testimony and signup process.

Created: 1/7/2020 11:02 AM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Briefing
11:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
Sunset Evaluation of the State Board of Veterinary Medical Examiners

Created: 1/9/2020 10:29 AM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
(1) Hospital Financial Assistance Policies; (2) Maryland Managed Care Organization Association Overview

Created: 1/7/2020 3:24 PM
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
Del Atterbeary

Public Safety - Rifles and Shotguns - Secondary Transactions
Oral testimony will be set at 90 seconds per person.

Created: 1/6/2020 10:35 AM
Ways and Means Committee - Briefing
11:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Briefing by the Bureau of Revenue Estimates

Created: 1/6/2020 10:32 AM
Ways and Means Committee - Briefing
2:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Briefing by the Maryland State Department of Education

Created: 1/9/2020 9:49 AM
Education Subcommittee - Briefing
3:30 PM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Briefing on the Maryland Center for School Safety

Other
Baltimore Symphony Orchestra, Workgroup on
Created: 1/7/2020 9:01 AM
2:00 PM - Miller Senate Building, Welcome Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
2:00 PM - Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
General Meeting
Update on BSO Vision Committee