Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 4/2/2020 9:32:06 AM
Thursday, January 16, 2020
Senate
Created: 12/11/2019 3:15 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Full Committee Briefing
Update on the implementation of Maryland's Greenhouse Gas Emissions Reduction Act (GGRA)

Created: 1/2/2020 10:44 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Bill Hearing
2:30 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Chr EHE (Dept)

Agriculture - Maryland Egg Law - Revisions
Chr EHE (Dept)

Environment - Lead Poisoning Prevention Commission
Chr EHE (Dept)

Environment - Marine Contractors Licensing Board - Authority, Program Evaluation, and Termination
Chr EHE (Dept)

Secretary of Agriculture - Weed Control Law
Chr EHE (Dept)

Land Use - Alcohol Production and Agricultural Alcohol Production

Created: 12/19/2019 4:07 PM
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Chr FIN (Dept)

Business Regulation - Trademarks, Service Marks, and Trade Names - Registration
Chr FIN (Dept)

Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Liability Insurance - Protests - Consumer Complaint Portal
Chr FIN (Dept)

Insurance - Universal and Variable Life Insurance - Notice
Chr FIN (Dept)

Real Estate Appraisers and Real Estate Appraiser Trainees - Licenses and Certificates - Experience, Renewal, and Reinstatement Requirements

Created: 1/8/2020 1:02 PM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Briefing on Racial and Gender Disparity in Incarceration in Maryland.

Created: 1/8/2020 1:02 PM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
3:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Bill hearings will begin immediately following the 1:00 pm briefing.
Sen Lee

Criminal Procedure - Evidence - Causing Unavailability of Witness
(Added - 1/9/2020 4:10 PM)
Sen Ellis

Real Property - Common Ownership Communities - Payment of Fees
Sen Lam

Public Buildings - Changing Facilities for Adult Diapers

House
Created: 1/8/2020 11:25 AM
Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee - Briefing
11:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
11:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Draft Greenhouse Gas Reduction Act

Created: 1/8/2020 11:28 AM
Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee - Briefing
2:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Public Service Commission Offshore Wind and Deregulated Suppliers Market

Created: 1/7/2020 11:07 AM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
Sustainable Forest Management in Maryland
(Added - 1/10/2020 10:42 AM)
Forestry
(Removed - 1/10/2020 10:37 AM)

Created: 1/9/2020 10:29 AM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
The Department of Legislative Services (DLS) on the Board of Physicians Sunset

Created: 1/7/2020 3:24 PM
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
Del Chang

Crimes - Hate Crimes - Use of an Item or a Symbol to Threaten or Intimidate
Del Barron, et al

Juvenile Proceedings - Fines, Fees, and Costs

Created: 12/18/2019 1:14 PM
Ways and Means Committee - Briefing
11:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Briefing by the Maryland State Lottery and Gaming Control Agency

Created: 1/7/2020 9:08 AM
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
1:30 PM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Del Cardin

Election Law - Campaign Material - Alteration of Definition
Del Palakovich Carr

Election Law - References to Absentee Voting in Communications - Mail-In Voting
Del Cardin

Election Law - Campaign Finance Violations - Injunctive Relief
Del Bartlett

Election Law - Individuals Released From Correctional Facilities - Voter Registration
Del Adams

Sales and Use Tax - Aircraft Parts and Equipment - Exemption
Dels Szeliga and Arikan

Baltimore County - Sales and Use Tax Exemption - Qualified Opportunity Zones
Del Chang

Attendance of Students - Lawful Absences - Mental Illness
(Removed - 1/15/2020 3:17 PM)

Other
Juvenile Justice Reform Council
Created: 12/20/2019 2:50 PM
1:30 PM to 3:30 PM - Harriett E. Brown Community Center, 901 Dares Beach Road, Prince Frederick, MD
Southern Maryland Regional Listening Session

Created: 12/20/2019 2:50 PM
6:30 PM to 8:30 PM - Harriett E. Brown Community Center, 901 Dares Beach Road, Prince Frederick, MD
Southern Maryland Regional Listening Session