Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 2/23/2020 12:20:03 AM
Tuesday, January 21, 2020
Senate
Created: 1/7/2020 1:10 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Department of Legislative Services on the State Board of Physicians Sunset Report recommendations.
(Added - 1/7/2020 1:56 PM)
Please note: the committee will accept limited public testimony following the presentation by the Department of Legislative Services.
(Added - 1/13/2020 6:47 PM)

Created: 1/8/2020 10:03 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Bill Hearing
1:30 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Chr EHE (Dept)

State Government - Delivery of Notices and Communications by Electronic Means - Authorized
Sens Simonaire and Peters

Funeral Establishments and Crematories - Unclaimed Cremains of Veterans - Notification, Disposition, and Reporting
Sen Ellis

Maryland Neighborhood Revitalization Funding
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
Sens Eckardt and Klausmeier

Health Occupations - Diagnostic Evaluation and Treatment of Patients - Disciplinary Actions (The Patient's Access to Integrative Healthcare Act of 2020)
Sen Lee

State Government - Department of Information Technology - Cybersecurity
Sen West

Public Information Act – Applications for Inspection – Responses and Time Limits
(Removed - 1/17/2020 12:13 PM)
Sen Kagan

Alcoholic Beverages - Manufacturer's Licenses - Requirements for Food Sales
(Removed - 1/21/2020 12:09 PM)

Created: 12/20/2019 1:29 PM
Finance Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Briefing: 5G Wireless Facilities

Created: 1/8/2020 1:08 PM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Department of Juvenile Services Briefing on Juvenile Justice.

Created: 1/8/2020 1:02 PM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
2:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Bill hearings will begin immediately following the 1:00 PM briefing.
Sen Waldstreicher

Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Pretrial Risk Assessment Instruments
Sen Ellis

Identification Cards and Driver's License Renewals - Inmates
Sen Reilly

Vehicle Laws – Cats and Dogs Left Unattended – Authorized Removal
(Added - 1/9/2020 11:39 AM)
Sen Lee

Criminal Procedure - Victims and Witnesses - Restrictions on Release of Personal Information
(Added - 1/17/2020 11:42 AM)
Sen Simonaire

State Highways - Commercial Signs in Rights-of-Way - Penalties
(Removed - 1/10/2020 11:17 AM)

House
Created: 1/8/2020 11:29 AM
Appropriations Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
School Construction

Created: 1/8/2020 3:02 PM
Economic Matters Committee - Briefing
10:30 AM - House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
or immediately following floor session
DLS Fiscal Briefing and Kirwan Report

Created: 1/9/2020 10:29 AM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
The Maryland Insurance Administration (MIA), Insurance Carriers, and the Legal Action Center on Network Adequacy

Created: 1/9/2020 12:33 PM
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
Del Guyton, et al

Criminal Law - Abuse or Neglect of a Vulnerable Adult - Causing Severe Emotional Distress
Del Metzgar

Criminal Procedure – Plea Agreement Terms and the Violence Prevention Initiative Criteria
Del Palakovich Carr

Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Pretrial Risk Assessment Instruments
Del Grammer

Courts and Judicial Proceedings - Contempt - Duress
Del Grammer

Criminal Trials - Spousal Privilege - Exception
Del Grammer

Criminal Procedure - Governor's Office of Crime Control and Prevention - Reporting of Seizures and Forfeitures
Del Moon, et al

Criminal Law - Sodomy and Unnatural or Perverted Sexual Practice - Repeal
(Added - 1/14/2020 10:53 AM)
Del Grammer

Criminal Procedure - Victims and Witnesses - Restrictions on Release of Personal Information
Del Grammer

Evidence - Causing Unavailability of Witness - Standard of Proof
(Removed - 1/13/2020 1:31 PM)
Del Grammer

Public Safety - Crime of Violence - Witness Intimidation
(Removed - 1/13/2020 1:31 PM)
Dels Barron and Henson

Criminal Procedure - Evidence - Causing Unavailability of Witness
(Removed - 1/15/2020 10:42 AM)

Created: 12/16/2019 3:08 PM
Ways and Means Committee - Briefing
2:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
2:30 PM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Briefing by the Department of Legislative Services on Fiscal Matters and the Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education (Kirwan Commission)

Other
No hearings scheduled for today