Day(s)
As of: 3/28/2024 2:58:25 PM
Created: 1/10/2020 3:00 PM
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Sen Patterson
Video Lottery Terminal Proceeds - Local Impact Grants - Reimbursement for Maryland Route 210 Projects
(Added - 1/15/2020 2:51 PM)
Sen Ellis
Disabled Active Duty Service Members, Disabled Veterans, and Surviving Spouses - Exemption From Property Tax and Other Charges and Refunds
(Added - 1/14/2020 1:50 PM)
Sens Young and Feldman
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Expenses of Medical Cannabis Grower, Processor, Dispensary, or Independent Testing Laboratory
(Added - 1/17/2020 1:03 PM)
(Added - 1/17/2020 1:03 PM)
(Removed - 1/14/2020 10:29 AM)
Created: 1/8/2020 10:03 AM
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Sen Reilly
Business Occupations and Professions - Master Electricians Guaranty Fund - Establishment
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
Sen Hayes
Higher Education - Policy on Student Concerns About Athletic Programs and Activities - Short Title
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Judicial Proceedings)
Sen Ellis
Counties - Construction of Sidewalks and Crosswalks - Safe Alternative Routes to Public Schools
Chr EHE (Dept)
Professional Engineers - Qualifications for Licensure - Experience Requirements
(Added - 1/8/2020 10:21 AM)
(Added - 1/15/2020 12:50 PM)
(Added - 1/20/2020 8:44 PM)
Canceled
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Bill Hearing
2:30 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Chr EHE (Dept)
Professional Engineers - Qualifications for Licensure - Experience Requirements
Created: 12/20/2019 1:29 PM
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Chr FIN (Dept)
Financial Institutions - State Banks, Trust Companies, and Savings Banks - Incorporators
Chr FIN (Dept)
Financial Institutions - Commissioner of Financial Regulation - Banking Institution Powers
Chr FIN (Dept)
Uninsured Employers' Fund - Additional Assessment on Awards and Settlements - Amount
(Removed - 1/20/2020 10:57 AM)
Created: 1/3/2020 11:45 AM
1:00 PM to 3:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Department of Legislative Services - Fiscal and Kirwin Briefings
Created: 1/13/2020 11:41 AM
3:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Bill hearings will begin immediately following the 1:00 pm briefing.
Sen West
Criminal Law - Abuse or Neglect of a Vulnerable Adult - Causing Severe Emotional Distress
Created: 1/10/2020 2:36 PM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 150, Annapolis, MD
Created: 1/10/2020 2:36 PM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Created: 1/14/2020 4:53 PM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
DNR: Power Plant Research Program
Required Reports: RPS, Nuclear Generation
Created: 1/8/2020 2:53 PM
11:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
State of the Bay
Created: 1/9/2020 10:29 AM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
(1) The Maryland Community Health Resources Commission (CHRC) on Rural Health Grants; (2) Update from the Maryland Medical Cannabis Commission (MMCC)
Created: 1/9/2020 12:33 PM
10:30 AM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
Department of Legislative Services – Fiscal and Kirwan Briefings
Created: 1/9/2020 12:33 PM
2:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
Del Grammer
Clerks of the Courts - Case Management System - Information on Judge or Magistrate
(Added - 1/10/2020 3:49 PM)
(Removed - 1/13/2020 8:55 PM)
Created: 1/6/2020 10:32 AM
11:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Briefing on Local Aid by the Department of Legislative Services, Maryland Association of Counties, and the Maryland Municipal League
Created: 1/16/2020 4:47 PM
Work Session
8:30 AM - Room 218 House Office Building, Howard County Delegation Room, 6 Bladen St., Annapolis, MD
Joint Work Session with the Senate Howard County Delegation - Select Committee No. 5
Created: 1/14/2020 5:05 PM
Work Session
11:00 AM
-
Joint Hearing Room, Department of Legislative Services, 90 State Circle, Annapolis, MD
10:30 AM - Room 206, Legislative Services Building, 90 State Circle, Annapolis
The meeting will convene immediately following session.
Created: 12/20/2019 3:03 PM
1:30 PM to 3:30 PM - White Oak Community Rec Center, 1700 April Lane, Silver Spring, MD
Metro Regional Listening Session
Created: 12/20/2019 3:03 PM
6:30 PM to 8:30 PM - White Oak Community Rec Center, 1700 April Lane, Silver Spring, MD
Metro Regional Listening Session
Created: 1/16/2020 4:48 PM
Work Session
8:30 AM - Room 218 House Office Building, Howard County Delegation Room, 6 Bladen St., Annapolis, MD
Joint with the House of Delegates Howard County Delegation