Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 2/26/2020 6:34:20 PM
Thursday, January 23, 2020
Senate
Created: 1/10/2020 2:36 PM
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD

Created: 1/10/2020 2:36 PM
Health and Human Services Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
1:00 PM - Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD

Created: 1/10/2020 2:36 PM
Public Safety, Transportation, and Environment Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
1:00 PM - Miller Senate Building, Schweinhaut Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD

Created: 1/8/2020 10:03 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Sen Simonaire

Hunting and Fishing Licenses - Active Military, Former Prisoners of War, Recipients of the Purple Heart Award, and Disabled Veterans
Sen Lam, et al

Solid Waste Management - Prohibition on Releasing a Balloon Into the Atmosphere
Sen Simonaire

Natural Resources - Fishing and Hunting Rights
Sen Simonaire

Maryland Veterans Service Animal Program - Definitions
Chr EHE (Dept)

Natural Resources - Nuisance Organisms - Pilot Projects and Northern Snakeheads
Sen Young

Agriculture - Management-Intensive Farming and Grazing
(Removed - 1/14/2020 1:22 PM)

Created: 1/10/2020 11:56 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Briefing
3:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Bay Restoration Overview and Update

Created: 12/20/2019 1:29 PM
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Chr FIN (Dept)

Insurance - Third Party Administrators - Term and Reinstatement of Registration
Chr FIN (Dept)

Vital Records - Birth Certificates - Change of Name of Child
Chr FIN (Dept)

Labor and Employment - Wage Payment and Collection - Order to Pay Wages
Chr FIN (Dept)

Correctional Institutions - Correctional Education Council - Mandatory Education Program Requirements
(Removed - 1/17/2020 10:46 AM)

Created: 1/15/2020 3:20 PM
Finance Committee - Briefing
3:00 PM - Department of Legislative Services Building, Joint Hearing Room, Annapolis, MD
FERC Order Briefing
Joint briefing with Economic Matters Committee

Created: 1/13/2020 11:41 AM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Sen West

Orphans' Courts - Appeals - Procedures
Sen West

Estates and Trusts - Estate Recoveries - Presentation of Claims Against Medicaid Recipients
Sen West

Estates and Trusts - Closed Estates - Subsequent Discovery of Check
(Added - 1/14/2020 9:54 AM)
Sen West

Estates and Trusts - Rule Against Perpetuities
(Added - 1/14/2020 9:54 AM)
Sen West

Real Property - Recordation of Deeds - Assignments of Rents and Assignments of Leases for Security Purposes
(Added - 1/14/2020 9:54 AM)

House
Canceled
Appropriations Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Del Carr

State Operating Budget - Publication of Expenditures

Created: 1/14/2020 9:31 AM
Appropriations Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
The Spkr, et al

Built to Learn Act of 2020
(Added - 1/16/2020 12:30 PM)
Del M. Jackson, et al

Local Pension Systems - Special Disability Retirement Allowance
(Removed - 1/17/2020 11:33 AM)
Del Carr, et al

Maryland Funding Accountability and Transparency Act - Nonbudgeted State Agencies
(Removed - 1/17/2020 11:33 AM)
Del Rosenberg

Maryland Technology Internship Program - Qualifications for Participation - Alterations
(Removed - 1/17/2020 11:33 AM)
Del Korman

Transportation - Maryland Metro/Transit Funding Act - Alterations
(Removed - 1/17/2020 11:33 AM)
St. Mary's County Delegation

St. Mary's County - Public Facilities Bond
(Removed - 1/17/2020 11:33 AM)
Del D.E. Davis (By Request)

Teachers' Pension System - Option Election
(Removed - 1/17/2020 11:33 AM)
Del Lierman, et al

Maryland Arts and Culture Capital Grant Program
(Removed - 1/17/2020 11:33 AM)
Del D.M. Davis, et al

Southern Maryland Rapid Transit Project - Requirements and Funding
(Removed - 1/17/2020 11:33 AM)
Del Krimm, et al

Unaccompanied Minors in Need of Shelter and Supportive Services
(Removed - 1/17/2020 11:33 AM)
Del Korman, et al

Higher Education - Collective Bargaining - Graduate Assistants (Graduate Assistant Collective Bargaining Fairness Act)
(Removed - 1/17/2020 11:33 AM)

Created: 1/16/2020 3:11 PM
Economic Matters Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
Del D.E. Davis

Public Service Commission - Public Utility Regulation Fund - Cap
Del Dumais

Insurance - Industry Automobile Insurance Association - Board of Directors

Created: 1/14/2020 4:53 PM
Economic Matters Committee - Briefing
3:00 PM - Department of Legislative Services Building, Joint Hearing Room, Annapolis, MD
FERC Order Briefing
Joint hearing with Senate Finance Committee

Created: 1/14/2020 10:20 AM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Briefing
11:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
Maryland Department of Agriculture
Legislative Priorities and Updates
State of Agriculture

Created: 1/9/2020 10:29 AM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
The Department of Legislative Services (DLS) on Fiscal Overview and the Kirwan Commission
(Added - 1/21/2020 2:34 PM)
The Department of Legislative Services (DLS) on Fiscal Overview and the Kirwin Commission
(Removed - 1/21/2020 2:34 PM)

Created: 1/10/2020 3:09 PM
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
Del Atterbeary

Family Law - Grounds for Divorce
Del Dumais

Family Law - Parentage and Adoption - Definitions
(Added - 1/14/2020 10:53 AM)
Del Atterbeary

Peace Orders - Workplace Violence
(Added - 1/15/2020 10:50 AM)
Del Henson, et al

Family Law - Nonpayment of Child Support - Sentencing
(Added - 1/15/2020 10:50 AM)
Del Guyton, et al

Crimes Against Animals - Interference With Livestock
(Added - 1/15/2020 10:50 AM)

Created: 1/6/2020 10:32 AM
Ways and Means Committee - Briefing
11:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Briefing by the Department of Commerce

Created: 12/18/2019 1:37 PM
Ways and Means Committee - Briefing
2:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Briefing on Election Law Issues

Other
No. 11 - Baltimore City
Created: 1/22/2020 12:41 PM
11:30 AM to 12:30 PM - Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
Baltimore City Senate Delegation Meeting