Day(s)
As of: 4/23/2024 2:11:16 AM
Created: 1/10/2020 11:56 AM
1:00 PM
-
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
1:00 PM - Department of Legislative Services Building, Joint Hearing Room, Annapolis, MD
Location change
Department of Legislative Services (DLS) Fiscal Overview
Created: 1/15/2020 10:29 AM
1:00 PM
-
West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
2:00 PM - Department of Legislative Services Building, Joint Hearing Room, Annapolis, MD
Location change
Sen Lam
Campaign Finance - Contributions, Expenditures, or Donations by Foreign-Influenced Corporations or Foreign Principals
Sen Kagan
Election Law - Individuals Released From Correctional Facilities - Voter Registration
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Judicial Proceedings)
(Removed - 1/15/2020 12:49 PM)
Created: 12/19/2019 11:57 AM
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Briefing: Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing Program and Rideshare Company Regulation
Created: 1/14/2020 12:00 PM
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Sen Hester
Vehicle Laws - Driver's Licenses Confiscated for Real ID Compliance - Failure to Possess or Display
Sens Eckardt and Carozza
Wicomico County - Landlord and Tenant - Repossession for Failure to Pay Rent - Procedures
Sen Waldstreicher
Motor Vehicle Administration - Authority to Suspend Registration for Violations Recorded by Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems - Repeal
(Added - 1/17/2020 11:42 AM)
Sen West
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Amendments to Declarations and Governing Documents
(Added - 1/23/2020 8:45 AM)
Created: 1/16/2020 12:21 PM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
(Added - 1/17/2020 11:35 AM)
Del Carr, et al
Maryland Funding Accountability and Transparency Act - Nonbudgeted State Agencies
(Added - 1/17/2020 11:35 AM)
Del Rosenberg
Maryland Technology Internship Program - Qualifications for Participation - Alterations
(Added - 1/17/2020 11:35 AM)
(Added - 1/17/2020 11:35 AM)
(Added - 1/17/2020 11:35 AM)
(Added - 1/17/2020 11:35 AM)
(Added - 1/17/2020 11:35 AM)
(Jointly assigned to Appropriations\Environment and Transportation)
(Added - 1/17/2020 11:35 AM)
(Added - 1/17/2020 11:35 AM)
Del Korman, et al
Higher Education - Collective Bargaining - Graduate Assistants (Graduate Assistant Collective Bargaining Fairness Act)
(Added - 1/17/2020 11:35 AM)
Dels Hettleman and Lierman
Higher Education - Policy on Student Concerns About Athletic Programs and Activities - Short Title
(Added - 1/24/2020 2:16 PM)
(Removed - 1/20/2020 8:05 PM)
Created: 1/8/2020 3:19 PM
11:00 AM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
Maryland Department of Transportation
Update on State Highway Public/Private Partnerships
Monorails in Transportation Networks
Created: 1/8/2020 3:27 PM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
Del Holmes
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Amendments to Declarations and Governing Documents
Del C. Watson, et al
Condominiums - Disclosures to Unit Owners and Prohibited Provisions in Instruments by Developers (Sunset Island Act)
Dels Parrott and Johnson
Local Government - Lemonade Stands - Prohibition on Regulation by Local Law
Del Holmes
Cooperative Housing Corporations, Condominiums, and Homeowners Associations - Reserve Studies
Created: 1/23/2020 3:17 PM
2:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
Fiscal Overview and Kirwan Commission
Created: 1/9/2020 10:29 AM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
The Maryland Insurance Administration (MIA), Maryland Department of Health (MDH), Pharmacy Benefit Managers (PBMs), Insurance Carriers, Pharmacists, EPIC Pharmacies, and Managed Care Organizations (MCOs) on PBM Regulations and Audit Overview; Department of Legislative Services (DLS) Fiscal Briefing on the Maryland Department of Health (MDH)
(Added - 1/24/2020 9:04 AM)
The Maryland Insurance Administration (MIA), Maryland Department of Health (MDH), Pharmacy Benefit Managers (PBMs), Insurance Carriers, Pharmacists, EPIC Pharmacies, and Managed Care Organizations (MCOs) on PBM Regulations and Audit Overview
(Removed - 1/24/2020 9:04 AM)
Created: 1/14/2020 10:53 AM
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
Del Moon, et al
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Reimbursement of Special Condition Costs
(Added - 1/15/2020 10:50 AM)
(Added - 1/15/2020 10:50 AM)
Del Cardin, et al
Criminal Law - Use or Possession of a Controlled Dangerous Substance - De Minimis Quantity
(Added - 1/16/2020 11:47 AM)
(Added - 1/16/2020 11:47 AM)
Del W. Fisher, et al
Criminal Procedure - Probation Before Judgment - Facts Justifying a Finding of Guilt and Suspension of Sentence
(Added - 1/16/2020 11:47 AM)
(Added - 1/16/2020 11:47 AM)
(Added - 1/17/2020 1:17 PM)
(Added - 1/17/2020 1:17 PM)
Del Atterbeary
Criminal Procedure - Motion to Vacate Judgment - Human Trafficking (True Freedom Act of 2020)
(Added - 1/17/2020 1:17 PM)
(Added - 1/17/2020 1:17 PM)
Del Pippy, et al
Sexual Solicitation of a Minor – Solicitation Through Parent, Guardian, or Custodian – Prohibition and Penalties
(Added - 1/17/2020 1:17 PM)
(Removed - 1/27/2020 5:59 PM)
Created: 1/13/2020 4:54 PM
1:00 PM
-
House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
1:15 PM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Del Healey
Environment - Public and Nonpublic Schools - Inspections for Mold Hazards and Mold or Moisture Problems
(Jointly assigned to Ways and Means\Environment and Transportation)
Del Palakovich Carr
Campaign Finance - Contributions, Expenditures, or Donations by Foreign-Influenced Corporations or Foreign Principals
(Added - 1/14/2020 9:05 AM)
Del Palakovich Carr
Economic Development - Opportunity Zone Incentives - Alteration of the More Jobs for Marylanders and Opportunity Zone Enhancement Programs
(Added - 1/14/2020 10:53 AM)
(Added - 1/14/2020 10:53 AM)
Del Grammer
Income Tax - Exemption - Individuals Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined
(Added - 1/14/2020 10:53 AM)
Created: 1/3/2020 1:57 PM
10:00 AM to 12:00 PM - 4th Floor Conference Room, Fred L. Wineland Building, 16 Francis Street, Annapolis, MD
Prior to the meeting the agenda will be posted to the Commission's webpage
Presentation