Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 2/19/2020 11:36:29 AM
Thursday, January 30, 2020
Senate
Created: 1/10/2020 2:36 PM
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD

Created: 1/10/2020 2:36 PM
Public Safety, Transportation, and Environment Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
1:00 PM - Miller Senate Building, Schweinhaut Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD

Created: 1/17/2020 9:28 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Sen West

Health Occupations - Violations of the Maryland Dentistry Act - Penalties and Cease and Desist Orders
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Judicial Proceedings)
Sen West

State Board of Dental Examiners - Practice of Dentistry - Revisions
Sen Lam, et al

University of Maryland, Baltimore - Study on the Health Effects of Air Traffic Noise
Chr EHE

State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
(Added - 1/17/2020 1:06 PM)
Sen West

Health Occupations - Social Workers - Scope of Practice, Supervision, and Application Decision Appeal Process
(Added - 1/22/2020 11:11 AM)

Created: 12/16/2019 12:20 PM
Finance Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Fiscal/Kirwan Briefing by the Department of Legislative Services

Created: 12/20/2019 2:03 PM
Finance Committee - Bill Hearing
2:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Or immediately following Briefing
Sens Kagan and Reilly (By Request)

Commission to Advance Next Generation 9-1-1 Across Maryland - Extension and Alteration
Chr FIN (Dept)

Correctional Institutions - Correctional Education Council - Mandatory Education Program Requirements
(Added - 1/24/2020 11:35 AM)
Sen Young

Office of Cemetery Oversight - Cemetery Financial Statement - Requirements
Sen Ellis

Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Doulas
Sen Ellis

Business Regulation - Home Builders - Performance Bond Requirement
(Removed - 1/28/2020 5:11 PM)

Created: 1/17/2020 11:42 AM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Sen Hough, et al

Correctional Facilities - Individuals Subject to Immigration Detainer - Homeland Security Notification
Sen Hough, et al

Public Safety - Permit to Carry, Wear, or Transport a Handgun - Qualifications
Sen Lee

Public Safety - Crime of Violence - Witness Intimidation
Sen West

Crimes Involving Controlled Dangerous Substances - Penalties - Methamphetamine
Sen Lee, et al

Criminal Law - Sexual Crimes - Repeal of Spousal Defense
Sen Lee, et al

Sexual Solicitation of a Minor - Solicitation Through Parent, Guardian, or Custodian - Prohibition and Penalties
Sen Ready, et al

Correctional Facilities - Individual Subject to Immigration Detainer - Homeland Security Notification
(Added - 1/23/2020 8:45 AM)

House
Created: 1/10/2020 2:36 PM
Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD

Created: 1/22/2020 11:38 AM
Economic Matters Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
Del Dumais

Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Insurance - Prohibition on Cancellation Due to Towing or Emergency Roadside Coverage Claims
Dels Dumais and C. Watson

Motor Carriers and For-Hire Driving Services - Nonprofit Organizations and Volunteer Drivers
Chr ECM (Dept)

Insurance - Uninsured or Enhanced Underinsured Motorist Coverage - Property Damage

Created: 1/14/2020 10:37 AM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
Maryland Department of the Environment
Legislative Priorities and Updates
Update on Activities of Maryland Climate Change Commission
Update on 2019 Greenhouse Gas Reduction Act Draft Plan

Created: 1/9/2020 10:56 AM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
2:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
Del Ebersole

Vehicle Laws – Driver’s Licenses Confiscated for Real ID Compliance – Failure to Possess or Display
Del Carr

Video Toll Violations - Intercounty Connector - Hearing Venue
Del Arentz

Chesapeake Bay Bridge - Reconstruction Advisory Group and Traffic Study
Del Carr, et al

Vehicle Laws - Intersections - Prohibited Acts
(Added - 1/13/2020 11:43 AM)
Del Carr, et al

Vehicle Laws - Failure to Pay Video Toll - Reform of Penalties
(Removed - 1/17/2020 12:08 PM)
Del Carr

Motor Vehicle Administration - Authority to Suspend Registration for Violations Recorded by Traffic Control Signal Monitoring Systems - Repeal
(Removed - 1/17/2020 12:08 PM)
Del Queen

Vehicle Laws - Special Registration Plates and Fund - Hunger Relief Initiatives
(Removed - 1/28/2020 10:24 AM)
Dels Carr and Moon

Vehicle Laws - Registration Renewal - Late Fee
(Removed - 1/29/2020 11:27 AM)

Created: 1/9/2020 10:29 AM
Health and Government Operations Committee - Briefing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
(1) Update from the University of Maryland Medical System (UMMS); (2) the Maryland Heath Care Commission (MHCC) on Mandated Benefits

Created: 1/16/2020 11:47 AM
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
2:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
Del Dumais

Child Support, Custody, and Visitation - Award of Expenses - Suit Money
Del Henson

Child Support - Suspension of Payments and Arrears for Incarcerated Obligors - Modifications
(Added - 1/17/2020 1:17 PM)
Del Atterbeary, et al

Protective Orders - Relief Eligibility - Rape and Sexual Offenses
(Added - 1/17/2020 1:17 PM)
Del Atterbeary

Family Law - Final Protective Order - Extension
(Added - 1/17/2020 1:17 PM)

Created: 1/16/2020 1:14 PM
Ways and Means Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Del Grammer

Baltimore County - Career Exploration and Development Activities in Public High Schools - Coffee
(Added - 1/16/2020 4:10 PM)
Del Krimm

State Lottery - Instant Ticket Lottery Machines - Fraternal Organizations ("ITLM" for Homeless Veterans Act)
(Added - 1/16/2020 3:18 PM)
Del Lierman, et al

Admissions and Amusement Tax - Electronic Bingo and Tip Jars - Distribution to Maryland State Arts Council
(Added - 1/16/2020 3:18 PM)
Del Luedtke

Special Education - Judicial Actions - Attorney's Fees and Related Costs
(Jointly assigned to Ways and Means\Judiciary)
Del Cain, et al

Restorative Schools Fund and Grants - Establishment
Del Reznik, et al

Public Schools - Provision of Menstrual Hygiene Products
Dels Kerr and K. Young

Education - High School Teachers Teaching Dual Enrollment Courses - Qualifications
(Removed - 1/28/2020 3:30 PM)

Canceled
Education Subcommittee - Briefing
3:30 PM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Briefing by the Department of Legislative Services on the Commission on Innovation and Excellence in Education (Kirwan Commission)

Other
No. 11 - Baltimore City
Canceled
11:30 AM to 12:30 PM - Miller Senate Building, William Amoss Room, 4th Floor, Annapolis, MD
Baltimore City Senate Delegation Meeting