Day(s)
As of: 9/18/2024 6:13:02 PM
Created: 1/21/2020 12:20 PM
1:00 PM
-
West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
2:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
(Added - 1/21/2020 4:46 PM)
Sen Pinsky, et al
State Finance and Procurement - Prohibited Appropriations - Magnetic Levitation Transportation System
(Jointly assigned to Budget and Taxation\Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
(Added - 1/21/2020 1:32 PM)
The Pres (Admin), et al
Income Tax Subtraction Modification – Correctional Officers, Law Enforcement Officers, and Fire, Rescue, and Emergency Services Personnel (Hometown Heroes Act)
(Added - 1/22/2020 2:52 PM)
(Added - 1/22/2020 2:52 PM)
(Added - 1/22/2020 2:52 PM)
(Added - 1/23/2020 4:25 PM)
(Added - 1/23/2020 4:25 PM)
(Added - 1/23/2020 4:25 PM)
(Added - 1/23/2020 4:25 PM)
(Added - 1/24/2020 12:01 PM)
Sens Serafini and Edwards
Sales and Use Tax Refund - Target Redevelopment Area - Washington County
(Added - 1/24/2020 12:01 PM)
Sen Serafini, et al
Corporations and Associations - Disadvantaged Business Enterprises and Veteran-Owned Small Business Enterprises - Filing Fee Exemption and Study
(Added - 1/24/2020 12:01 PM)
(Removed - 1/31/2020 12:57 PM)
Created: 1/23/2020 1:07 PM
2:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Sen Feldman
Maryland Transportation Authority - Video Streaming and Archiving - Open Meetings
Sen Kagan
Public Information Act - Denial of Part of a Public Record - Investigations by Inspectors General
Sen Elfreth, et al
City of Annapolis - Housing Authority - Prohibitions Against Exceptions to Local Laws
Chr Jt Audit Com
State Government - Office of Legislative Audits - Costs and Frequency of Audits
Sen Griffith, et al
Department of Veterans Affairs - Homes for Veterans - Veterans of Uniformed Service
The Pres (Admin), et al
State Government - Protection of Information - Revisions (Maryland Data Privacy Act)
(Removed - 1/23/2020 2:11 PM)
The Pres (Admin), et al
Renewable Energy Development and Siting (REDS) – Evaluations and Tax and Fee Exemptions
(Removed - 1/27/2020 3:59 PM)
(Removed - 1/27/2020 3:59 PM)
(Removed - 1/27/2020 3:59 PM)
(Removed - 1/27/2020 3:59 PM)
Sen Carter, et al
Environment - Drinking Water Outlets in School Buildings - Testing for Elevated Level of Lead
(Removed - 1/27/2020 3:59 PM)
Created: 1/13/2020 2:16 PM
2:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Sens Hershey and Reilly
Chesapeake Bay Bridge - Reconstruction Advisory Group and Traffic Study
Sen Feldman
Maryland Health Benefit Exchange - Establishment of a State-Based Health Insurance Subsidies Program
Sen Feldman
Private Passenger Motor Vehicle Insurance - Prohibition on Cancellation Due to Towing or Emergency Roadside Coverage Claims
Created: 1/21/2020 4:37 PM
1:00 PM
-
East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
2:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
(Added - 1/23/2020 8:45 AM)
Sen Cassilly, et al
Juvenile Law - Jurisdiction - Attempted Carjacking and Attempted Armed Carjacking
Sen West, et al
Criminal Procedure - Petition to Modify or Reduce Sentence (Maryland Second Look Act)
(Added - 1/31/2020 2:26 PM)
Canceled
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 150, Annapolis, MD
Morgan State University
Salisbury University
University of Maryland Global Campus
UM Center for Environmental Science
Canceled
Education and Economic Development Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 150, Annapolis, MD
USM Overview
University System of Maryland Office
Created: 1/31/2020 3:03 PM
2:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 150, Annapolis, MD
Canceled
Public Safety and Administration Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Office of the Public Defender
Department of Veterans Affairs
Office of Administrative Hearings
Department of General Services
Created: 1/31/2020 3:03 PM
2:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Canceled
Transportation and the Environment Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Public Service Commission
Office of People's Counsel
Department of Agriculture
Created: 1/31/2020 3:03 PM
3:15 PM - House Office Building, Room 120, Annapolis, MD
Created: 1/24/2020 5:09 PM
2:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
Del C. Watson, et al
Motor Vehicle and Homeowner's Insurance - Use of Claim History in Rating Policies
(Added - 1/28/2020 4:02 PM)
Canceled
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
Chr ENT (Dept)
Nutrient Management - Professional Fertilizer Applicators - Requirements and Penalties
Del Barron
Public Ethics - Officials and Lobbyists - Reporting of Ceremonial Gifts and Awards of Insignificant Monetary Value
Del Carey
Hunting and Fishing Licenses - Active Military, Former Prisoners of War, Recipients of the Purple Heart Award, and Disabled Veterans
Del Stewart, et al
Public Ethics - Executive Branch - Lobbying by Former Secretaries of Principal Departments (Shut the Revolving Door Act of 2020)
Created: 1/31/2020 9:47 AM
Housing and Real Property Subcommittee
3:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
Created: 1/23/2020 1:14 PM
1:00 PM
-
House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
2:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 240, Annapolis, MD
Del K. Young, et al
Health Care Facilities - Hospitals and Related Institutions - Discrimination Protections
Del Barron, et al
Behavioral Health Administration - Children With Mental Disorders - List of Available Services
Del Cullison
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Participation of School-Based Health Centers - Regulations
Created: 1/13/2020 8:55 PM
2:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
(Added - 1/14/2020 1:33 PM)
(Added - 1/17/2020 1:17 PM)
(Added - 1/22/2020 8:36 AM)
Del Love, et al
Criminal Law - Deadly Weapons on School Property - Nonpublic Schools (No Weapons on Nonpublic School Property Act)
(Added - 1/22/2020 12:33 PM)
Dels Rosenberg and Cardin
Courts - Civil Actions - Strategic Lawsuits Against Public Participation
(Added - 1/22/2020 12:33 PM)
Del Malone
Estates and Trusts - Estate Recoveries - Presentation of Claims Against Medicaid Recipients
(Added - 1/24/2020 4:04 PM)
(Added - 1/24/2020 4:04 PM)
(Removed - 1/14/2020 1:36 PM)
The Spkr (Admin), et al
Crimes - Firearms - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2020)
(Removed - 1/22/2020 10:46 AM)
(Removed - 1/28/2020 1:45 PM)
Del Hartman, et al
Criminal Law - Life-Threatening Injury Involving a Motor Vehicle or Vessel - Criminal Negligence (Wade's Law)
(Removed - 2/4/2020 5:05 PM)
Created: 1/21/2020 1:19 PM
2:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 130, Annapolis, MD
Allegany County Delegation
Allegany County Board of Education - Elected Members - Filling a Vacancy
Dels Szeliga and Kittleman
Education - Maryland High School Diploma - Civics Test Requirement
Frederick County Delegation
Frederick County - Career Exploration and Development Activities - Coffee
Del Lisanti, et al
Public Schools – Medical Cannabis – Guidelines for Administration to Students (Connor’s Courage)
(Removed - 2/3/2020 2:12 PM)
Prince George's County Delegation
Prince George's County - Board of Education Budget - Category PG 502-20
(Removed - 2/4/2020 10:16 AM)
Prince George's County Delegation
Prince George's County - Elementary School Students - Daily Physical Activity PG 503-20
(Removed - 2/4/2020 5:12 PM)
Created: 2/3/2020 4:10 PM
Work Session
8:30 AM - Room 218 House Office Building, Howard County Delegation Room, 6 Bladen St., Annapolis, MD
Howard County Delegation Work Session
Created: 12/20/2019 3:33 PM
1:30 PM to 3:30 PM - Chesapeake College Higher Education Center Todd Performing Arts Center, 1000 College Circle, Wye Mills, MD
Upper Shore Regional Listening Session
Created: 12/20/2019 3:33 PM
6:30 PM to 8:30 PM - Chesapeake College Higher Education Center Todd Performing Arts Center, 1000 College Circle, Wye Mills, MD
Upper Shore Regional Listening Session
Canceled
9:00 AM - One Call Center, Suite 104, Lower Level Conference Rm., 7223 Parkway Drive, Hanover, MD
Meeting of the Full Authority + Hearings
Created: 2/3/2020 4:37 PM
Work Session
8:30 AM - Room 218 House Office Building, Howard County Delegation Room, 6 Bladen St., Annapolis, MD
Howard County Delegation Work Session