Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 3/8/2021 6:11:54 PM
Tuesday, February 23, 2021
House
Created: 1/28/2021 10:18 AM
Economic Matters Committee - Bill Hearing
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Carey

Unemployment Insurance - Study on System Reforms
(Added - 2/8/2021 12:15 PM)
Del Carey

Unemployment Insurance - Employer Contributions - Payment Plans
(Added - 2/8/2021 12:15 PM)
Del Charkoudian

Unemployment Insurance - Revisions and Required Study
(Added - 2/8/2021 12:15 PM)
Del Wivell

Unemployment Insurance - Earned Rating Record - Charging of Benefits
(Added - 2/8/2021 12:15 PM)
Del Carey

Unemployment Insurance – Maryland Department of Labor – Accountability and Oversight
(Added - 2/8/2021 12:15 PM)
Del Carey

Unemployment Insurance – Weekly Benefit Amount – Income Disregard
(Added - 2/8/2021 12:15 PM)
Del Carey

Unemployment Insurance - Work Sharing (Work Share Expansion Act of 2021)
(Added - 2/8/2021 4:13 PM)
Del Valderrama

Labor and Employment - Family and Medical Leave Insurance Program - Establishment (Time to Care Act of 2021)
(Removed - 2/8/2021 12:15 PM)
Del Beitzel

Unemployment Insurance – Earned Rating Record – Waiver of Benefit Charges Due to COVID–19
(Removed - 2/18/2021 1:10 PM)
Del Carey

Unemployment Insurance - Earned Rating Record - Waiver of Benefit Charges Due to COVID-19
(Removed - 2/18/2021 1:15 PM)

Click to return on the top page