Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 3/8/2021 5:51:43 PM
Tuesday, February 23, 2021
House
Created: 2/7/2021 10:27 AM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Del Grammer

Baltimore County - Nuisance Actions - Community Association
(Added - 2/10/2021 10:21 AM)
Mont Co Deleg and PG Co Deleg

Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission – Board of Ethics – Financial Disclosure Statements – Late Fees MC/PG 102–21
Montgomery County Delegation

Montgomery County – Housing Opportunities Commission – Public Body MC 07–21
Carroll County Delegation

Carroll County - Sheriff - Salary
(Added - 2/10/2021 10:21 AM)
Del Holmes

Real Property – Condominiums, Homeowners Associations, and Cooperative Housing Corporations – Virtual Meetings
Del Stewart

Public Ethics - Disclosures, Training, and Use of Confidential Information (Integrity in High Office Act)
Del Stewart

Department of Housing and Community Development – Partnership Rental Housing Program – Alterations (Mixed–Income Housing Act of 2021)
Del Bridges

Housing and Community Development - Neighborhood Revitalization - Passive House Pilot Program
Del Bridges

Real Property – Residential Contract of Sale – Buyer Identification
Del Conaway

Real Property - Residential Lease Provisions - Responsibility of Tenant for Maintenance and Repair
(Added - 2/10/2021 10:21 AM)
Del Conaway

Landlord and Tenant – Estoppel Certificates – Notice of Receipt by Landlord
(Added - 2/10/2021 10:21 AM)
Del Conaway

Landlord and Tenant – Cancellation or Renewal of Lease – Notification Requirement
(Added - 2/10/2021 10:21 AM)

Land Use and Ethics Subcommittee - (Environment and Transportation Committee)
Created: 2/16/2021 1:51 PM
Land Use and Ethics Subcommittee - Work Session
12:30 PM to 1:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube

Natural Resources, Agriculture & Open Space Subcommittee - (Environment and Transportation Committee)
Created: 2/23/2021 12:40 PM
Natural Resources, Agriculture & Open Space Subcommittee - Work Session
5:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
4:40 PM - Zoom / YouTube

Click to return on the top page