Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 3/8/2021 6:35:28 PM
Tuesday, February 23, 2021
Senate
Created: 2/4/2021 9:26 AM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
2:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Sen Ready

Motor Vehicles - Inspection Certificates - Exception
Sen Young

Criminal Procedure – Victims of Sexually Assaultive Behavior – Required Meeting
(Added - 2/9/2021 5:11 PM)
Sen Kagan, et al

Public Safety – Statewide 3–1–1 Nonemergency Telephone System
Sen Waldstreicher

Drunk Driving Offenses - Ignition Interlock System Program
Sen West

Estates and Trusts - Wills - Custodianship
Sen Bailey

Criminal Procedure – Expungement – Entitlement
(Added - 2/17/2021 10:56 AM)
Sen West

Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Entitlement
Sen Hough, et al

Vehicle Laws - Protective Headgear Requirement for Motorcycle Riders - Exception
Sen Smith

Maryland Model Prisons For Youthful Offenders Study Act
(Removed - 2/19/2021 11:08 AM)

Created: 2/22/2021 7:22 PM
Judicial Proceedings Committee - Voting Session
4:00 PM - East Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
6:00 PM - Zoom / YouTube
Sen Carter

Law Enforcement Officers - Use of Force

Click to return on the top page