Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 4/4/2020 6:04:43 AM
Wednesday, February 26, 2020
House
Created: 1/24/2020 5:09 PM
Economic Matters Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 230, Annapolis, MD
Del Carey, et al

Commercial Law - Personal Information Protection Act - Revisions
Del C. Watson

Financial Institutions - Security Questions and Measures
Del Love, et al

Commercial Law - Consumer Protection - Biometric Identifiers and Biometric Information Privacy
Del Reznik, et al

Commercial Law - Maryland Net Neutrality Act of 2020
(Added - 2/6/2020 5:04 PM)
Dels Carey and C. Watson

Consumer Protection - Security Features for Connected Devices
(Added - 2/10/2020 3:27 PM)
Del Love

Maryland Personal Information Protection Act – Geolocation Information and Unfair, Abusive, and Deceptive Trade Practices
(Added - 2/10/2020 3:27 PM)
Dels C. Watson and Carey

Consumer Protection - Right to Opt Out of Third-Party Disclosure
(Removed - 2/24/2020 6:54 PM)