Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 4/10/2020 3:13:14 AM
Wednesday, February 26, 2020
Senate
Created: 2/5/2020 3:56 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 2, Annapolis, MD
Sen Patterson, et al

State Real Estate Commission – Continuing Education Requirements – Ethics and Professionalism
Sens Klausmeier and Zucker

Maryland Senator Edward J. Kasemeyer College Investment Plan - State Contributions - Alterations
Sens Patterson and Kagan

State Board of Dental Examiners - Dental Specialization - Requirements
Sens Rosapepe and Ready

University System of Maryland - Textbooks - Availability of Free Digital Materials (Textbook Transparency Act of 2020)
Sen Klausmeier

State Board of Environmental Health Specialists - Fees - General Fund
Sen Klausmeier

Health Occupations - Physical Therapists and Physical Therapist Assistants - Qualifications
Sen Lam

Health Occupations - Athletic Training - Revisions
Sen Elfreth

Sustainable Maryland Program Fund - Establishment
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
Sen Lam

State Board of Physicians - Genetic Counselors - Licensing
Sen Augustine

State Board of Professional Counselors and Therapists - Maryland Music Therapists Act
Sens Patterson and Augustine

Higher Education - Admissions Process - Criminal History
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Judicial Proceedings)
Sen Hester

Public Health – Cyber Safety Handbook – Handbook Development and Publication
Sen Hester

Maryland Technology Internship Program – Units of State Government
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
Sens Hester and Serafini

Education - Maryland Data Analysis and Accountability Program - Established
(Added - 2/20/2020 11:36 AM)
Sen McCray, et al

Maryland Electricians Act of 2020
Sen Lam, et al

Maryland Department of Health - Public Health Outreach Programs - Cognitive Impairment, Alzheimer's Disease, and Other Types of Dementia
(Removed - 2/6/2020 5:15 PM)
Sen Ready

Maryland Department of Labor - Occupational Licenses - Waiver of Application Fees
(Removed - 2/10/2020 6:02 PM)
Sen Hester

Commission on Student Behavioral Health and Mental Health Treatment
(Removed - 2/24/2020 12:12 PM)
Sen Hayes

Health Services Initiative - Vision Care for Low-Income Children
(Removed - 2/24/2020 1:35 PM)