Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 4/3/2020 1:32:33 AM
Wednesday, February 26, 2020
House
Created: 1/30/2020 3:42 PM
Environment and Transportation Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 250, Annapolis, MD
Del Lehman, et al

Crimes - Unattended Dogs in Extreme Weather Conditions
(Added - 2/5/2020 1:53 PM)
Del Stewart, et al

Environment - Sale and Application of Coal Tar Pavement Products - Prohibition
Del Love, et al

Beverage Container Deposit Program - Establishment and Advisory Commission
(Jointly assigned to Environment and Transportation\Economic Matters)
(Added - 2/5/2020 1:53 PM)
Del Grammer

Sewage Treatment Plants - Effluent Discharges - Impacts on Midge Populations
(Added - 2/5/2020 1:53 PM)
Del Hill

Department of the Environment - Nontidal Wetlands - Study of Vernal Pools
(Added - 2/5/2020 1:53 PM)
Del Boyce, et al

Unlawful Taking of Oysters From Submerged Land Leases and Water Column Leases - Penalties
(Added - 2/5/2020 1:53 PM)
Del Stein, et al

Natural Resources - Organized Hunting Contests - Restrictions
(Added - 2/5/2020 1:53 PM)
Del Boyce, et al

Maryland Paint Stewardship Program
(Jointly assigned to Environment and Transportation\Economic Matters)
(Added - 2/5/2020 1:53 PM)
Del Shetty, et al

Environment - Statewide Green Business Certification Program - Establishment
(Added - 2/5/2020 1:53 PM)
Del Beitzel, et al

Black Bear Damage Reimbursement Fund - Pets
(Added - 2/5/2020 1:53 PM)
Del Grammer

Illegal Dumping and Litter Control - Criminal Penalties and Fund
(Added - 2/5/2020 1:53 PM)
Del Hornberger, et al

Snare Traps – Prohibition Against Use, Sale, Possession, Setting, Placing, or Maintaining – Alterations
(Added - 2/6/2020 11:37 AM)
Del Smith, et al

Environment - Business Recycling Reporting Requirements
(Jointly assigned to Environment and Transportation\Economic Matters)
(Added - 2/6/2020 11:37 AM)
Del Smith, et al

Solid Waste Management - Refuse Disposal Systems - Incinerators, Scrap Tires, and Local Authority
(Added - 2/6/2020 11:37 AM)
Del Hettleman, et al

Agriculture - Hemp Research and Production - Prohibitions
(Removed - 2/7/2020 10:17 AM)
Del Cardin, et al

Agriculture - License to Produce Hemp - Limitation
(Removed - 2/7/2020 10:17 AM)
Del Mautz, et al

Natural Resources - Reclassification of Oyster Sanctuaries - Authorization
(Removed - 2/25/2020 9:24 AM)
Del Adams

Hunting - Regulated Shooting Areas - Offshore Stationary Blinds and Blind Sites
(Removed - 2/26/2020 10:05 AM)