Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Day(s)

As of: 10/21/2020 11:10:54 PM
Wednesday, February 26, 2020
House
Created: 1/28/2020 2:22 PM
Judiciary Committee - Bill Hearing
1:00 PM - House Office Building, Room 100, Annapolis, MD
Del Shetty, et al

Estates and Trusts - Health Savings Accounts - Establishment
(Added - 2/4/2020 5:10 PM)
Del Valentino-Smith, et al

Drugged Driving - Oral Fluid Tests - Pilot Program
(Added - 2/4/2020 5:10 PM)
Del McComas, et al

Courts - Documentary Evidence - Protective Order
(Added - 2/4/2020 5:10 PM)
Del Moon, et al

Vehicle Laws - Canceled, Revoked, and Suspended Driver's Licenses - Penalties
(Added - 2/4/2020 5:10 PM)
Del Cardin

Maryland Trust Act - Liability of Trustee - Report and Release by Interested Party
(Added - 2/6/2020 9:40 AM)
Del Dumais, et al

Criminal Law - Untraceable Firearms
(Added - 2/6/2020 9:40 AM)
Dels Atterbeary and J. Lewis

Drunk Driving Offenses - Ignition Interlock System Program
(Added - 2/6/2020 9:40 AM)
Del Dumais, et al

Compensation to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined or Whose Conviction or Adjudication Is Reversed
(Added - 2/6/2020 9:40 AM)
Dels Kipke and Chisholm

Civil Actions - Tortious Injury to or Death of Pet - Compensatory Damages (Buddy's Law)
(Added - 2/7/2020 4:52 PM)
Del Barron, et al

Adjudicatory Hearings - Attorney Security Passes for Attorneys in Good Standing
(Added - 2/6/2020 9:40 AM)
Del Cardin

Motor Vehicle Administration Police - Powers
(Added - 2/6/2020 9:40 AM)
Del Moon

Civil Actions - Noneconomic Damages - Personal Injury or Wrongful Death
(Added - 2/6/2020 9:40 AM)
Del Wilson

Circuit Court Judges - Retention Election
(Jointly assigned to Judiciary\Ways and Means)
(Added - 2/6/2020 9:40 AM)
Del Korman, et al

Public Safety - Licensed Firearms Dealers (Firearms Dealers' Safety Act)
(Added - 2/7/2020 4:52 PM)
Del Bartlett

Courts - Grand Jury Proceedings - Recordings and Transcripts
(Added - 2/7/2020 4:52 PM)
Del Kipke, et al

Criminal Procedure - Cameras in the Courtroom - Criminal Sentencing Hearings (Cameras in the Courtroom Act of 2020)
(Added - 2/7/2020 4:52 PM)
Del Brooks

Comptroller - Duties - Designations of and Responses to Personal Representatives
(Added - 2/7/2020 4:52 PM)
Del Buckel, et al

Criminal Procedure - Forfeiture of Firearms - Sale to Dealer
(Added - 2/10/2020 1:17 PM)
Dels Barron and Bartlett

Circuit Court Judges - Selection and Tenure
(Added - 2/10/2020 1:17 PM)
Dels Hornberger and Arikan

Vehicle Laws - Military Surplus Vehicles - Registration and Operation
(Added - 2/11/2020 12:22 PM)
Del Lisanti

Civil Actions – Duty to Render Assistance (First Responder Safety Act)
(Removed - 2/26/2020 9:54 AM)