Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Day(s)

As of: 4/17/2021 4:00:09 AM
Friday, February 26, 2021
Senate
Created: 2/25/2021 11:06 AM
Budget and Taxation Committee - Voting Session
10:00 AM - West Miller Senate Building, Room 3, Annapolis, MD
Sen Kagan

Maryland Nonprofit Development Center Program – Nonprofit, Interest–Free, Micro Bridge Loan (NIMBL) Account – Funding
(Added - 2/25/2021 1:53 PM)
Sen Ferguson

Education - Adult High School Pilot Program - Funding and Grants
(Added - 2/25/2021 1:53 PM)
Sen Elfreth, et al

Maryland 529 Program – Board Authority and State Contribution – Alterations
(Added - 2/25/2021 1:53 PM)
Sens Guzzone and Elfreth

Clean Water Commerce Act of 2021
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
(Added - 2/25/2021 1:53 PM)
Sen Pinsky, et al

Climate Solutions Now Act of 2021
(Jointly assigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs\Budget and Taxation)
(Added - 2/25/2021 1:53 PM)
Sen Ferguson

Digital Advertising Gross Revenues Tax – Exemption and Restriction
(Added - 2/26/2021 9:57 AM)

Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - (Budget and Taxation Committee)
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
Education, Business and Administration Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
1:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
2:30 PM - Virtual Meeting

Health and Human Services Subcommittee - (Budget and Taxation Committee)
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
Health and Human Services Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
2:30 PM - Zoom / YouTube

Public Safety, Transportation, and Environment Subcommittee - (Budget and Taxation Committee)
Created: 12/22/2020 1:25 PM
Public Safety, Transportation, and Environment Subcommittee - Budget Hearing
1:30 PM - Virtual Meeting
2:30 PM - Virtual Meeting

Click to return on the top page